Case: 10-17-00169-CR    
10-17-00169-CR
05/16/2017
Poss of a Controlled Substance
Brian Austin Kelley 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
11/27/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
09/26/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/04/2017Set for submission on briefs 
11/27/2017Case ready to be set 
11/27/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
10/31/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
10/25/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/26/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
08/29/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
08/28/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/01/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
07/27/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/27/2017Reporters record filed 
06/02/2017Clerks record filed 
05/25/2017Trial court certification filed 
05/19/2017Docketing statement filed 
05/16/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
04/17/2017Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
04/10/2017Sentence imposed in the trial court 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/27/2017SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Kelley, Brian AustinCriminal - AppellantJustin Bradford Smith
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasCharles Karakashian Jr.
Dustin H. Boyd
Trial Court Information
52nd District Court 
Coryell 
Honorable Trent D. Farrell 
16-23449 
Jeannye L. Skinner 
2 yrs StateJail Div, TDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site