Tenth Court of Appeals

Case: 10-17-00140-CR    
10-17-00140-CR
04/28/2017
Evading Arrest
Marcus Antione Hervey 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/23/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
08/04/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/04/2017Set for submission on briefs 
11/27/2017Supplemental reporters record filed 
11/22/2017Order entered 
08/23/2017Case ready to be set 
08/23/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
08/08/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
08/04/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
08/04/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
07/20/2017Notice of late brief 
06/16/2017Reporters record filed 
05/22/2017Docketing statement requested 
05/04/2017Clerks record filed 
05/04/2017Trial court certification filed 
05/02/2017Letter issued by the court 
04/28/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
04/26/2017Sentence imposed in the trial court 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/06/2017StatusSupplemental reporters record due
12/27/2017SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasRobert L. Koehl
R. Lowell Thompson
Hervey, Marcus AntioneCriminal - AppellantDamara H. Watkins
Trial Court Information
County Court 
Navarro 
Honorable H. M. Davenport 
73223 
Carla Clark 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site