Case: 10-17-00131-CR    
10-17-00131-CR
04/21/2017
Evading Arrest
Paddock Collins 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/03/2017Anders brief filed 
08/01/2017Anders brief filedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/20/2017Set for submission on briefs 
11/17/2017Case ready to be set 
10/19/2017Letter issued by the court 
10/16/2017Pro Se response filed 
09/13/2017Order entered 
08/30/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/03/2017Anders brief filedAttorney provided for record.
08/01/2017Motion to withdraw attorney filed 
08/01/2017Anders brief filed 
07/11/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
07/11/2017Reporters record filed 
06/30/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/31/2017Reporters record filed 
05/26/2017Clerks record filed 
05/05/2017Docketing statement filed 
04/25/2017Appearance of counsel 
04/21/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
03/28/2017Sentence imposed in the trial court 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/01/2017MotionMotion to withdraw as attorney
12/13/2017SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Collins, Paddock Criminal - AppellantPaddock Collins
Clint F. Sare
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasChristopher L. Thompson
David P. Weeks
Trial Court Information
278th District Court 
Walker 
Honorable Hon. Hal R. Ridley 
27689 
Sherry L. Stephens 
15 yrs TDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site