Tenth Court of Appeals

Case: 10-17-00131-CR    
Evading Arrest
Paddock Collins 
The State of Texas 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/03/2017Anders brief filed 
08/01/2017Anders brief filedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/16/2018Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsMotion granted; no further extensions of time will be entertained
02/12/2018Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals 
01/02/2018Certification of Compliance that opinion sent to criminal defendant 
12/20/2017Memorandum opinion issuedModified/Reformed and Affirmed
12/20/2017Motion to withdraw attorney disposedGrant motion
12/20/2017Retention time case file will be retained 
12/20/2017Judgment Issued 
11/20/2017Set for submission on briefs 
11/17/2017Case ready to be set 
10/19/2017Letter issued by the court 
10/16/2017Pro Se response filed 
09/13/2017Order entered 
08/30/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/03/2017Anders brief filedAttorney provided for record.
08/01/2017Motion to withdraw attorney filed 
08/01/2017Anders brief filed 
07/11/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
07/11/2017Reporters record filed 
06/30/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/31/2017Reporters record filed 
05/26/2017Clerks record filed 
05/05/2017Docketing statement filed 
04/25/2017Appearance of counsel 
04/21/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
03/28/2017Sentence imposed in the trial court 
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/16/2018StatusMandate to Issue
Collins, Paddock Criminal - AppellantPaddock Collins
Clint F. Sare
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasChristopher L. Thompson
David P. Weeks
Trial Court Information
278th District Court 
Honorable Hon. Hal R. Ridley 
Sherry L. Stephens 
15 yrs TDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site