Tenth Court of Appeals

Case: 10-17-00001-CV    
10-17-00001-CV
01/03/2017
Administrative Law - Summary Judgment
Larry Joe Moore 
Bearkat Energy Partners, LLC, William Bramlett, Jason B. Lane, and Jason B. Lane Energy Partners II, LLC 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/03/2017Reply brief filedAppellant
09/07/2017Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
06/09/2017Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/29/2018Case stored 
05/29/2018Mandate issued 
05/29/2018Bill of costs 
04/13/2018Motion for extension of time to file petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtGrant motion
04/12/2018Motion for extension of time to file petition for review filed in Supreme Court 
02/27/2018Motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Denied
02/12/2018Motion for rehearing filed 
01/31/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
01/31/2018Retention time case file will be retained 
01/31/2018Judgment Issued 
12/20/2017Submitted 
11/29/2017Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
10/03/2017Reply brief filed 
09/19/2017Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedGrant motion
09/12/2017Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
09/07/2017Case ready to be set 
09/07/2017Brief filed - oral argument requested 
08/14/2017Notice of late brief 
08/01/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
07/27/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
07/05/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
06/27/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/15/2017Appearance of counsel 
06/14/2017Supplemental clerks record filed 
06/13/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedDismissed as moot
06/09/2017Brief filed - oral argument requested 
06/06/2017Motion disposedGrant motion
06/05/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/26/2017Letter issued by the court 
05/24/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
05/24/2017Response filed 
05/23/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
05/17/2017Recusal of appellate court justice(s) 
05/17/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/09/2017Motion filed 
04/25/2017Motion to withdraw attorney disposedGrant motion
04/21/2017Response filed 
04/12/2017Motion to withdraw attorney filed 
04/11/2017Response requested by the court 
04/11/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
04/11/2017Motion to withdraw attorney disposedMotion or Writ Struck
03/31/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/31/2017Motion filed 
03/27/2017Supplemental clerks record filed 
03/27/2017Clerks record filed 
03/17/2017Motion to withdraw attorney filed 
03/07/2017Extension of time to file clerks record disposedGrant motion
02/28/2017Extension of time to file clerks record filed 
02/24/2017Notice filed 
01/30/2017Reporters record filed 
01/20/2017Docketing statement filed 
01/03/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
10/06/2016Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/30/2024Case StoredSend 6 year letter in cv cases
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Moore, Larry JoeAppellantBenjamin Major
Kevin R. Knight
Christopher L. Gadoury
Ryan Ellis
W. Mark Lanier
Jason B. Lane Energy Partners II, LLCAppelleeCorey J. Seel
David B. Gaultney
Elana S. Einhorn
Bramlett, William AppelleeWilliam Bramlett
Bearkat Energy Partners, LLCAppellee 
Lane, Jason B.AppelleeDavid B. Gaultney
Corey J. Seel
Elana S. Einhorn
Trial Court Information
87th District Court 
Leon 
Honorable Deborah Oakes Evans 
NOT-12-250 
Ellen Earles 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site