Tenth Court of Appeals

Case: 10-15-00235-CR    
10-15-00235-CR
07/01/2015
Mandamus
In re Matthew Alan Clendennen 
 
Yes 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/06/2015Amicus curiae brief received 
09/25/2015Amicus curiae brief received 
09/16/2015Amicus curiae brief received 
09/16/2015Amicus curiae brief received 
09/15/2015Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
09/14/2015Brief filed - oral argument not requestedReal party in interest
08/07/2015Amicus curiae brief received 
07/31/2015Reply brief filedRelator
07/30/2015Brief filed - oral argument requestedState
07/24/2015Amicus curiae brief received 
07/24/2015Amicus curiae brief received 
07/09/2015Petition for writ of mandamus filedRelator
07/08/2015Appendix filedRelator
07/02/2015Appendix filedRelator
07/01/2015Petition for writ of mandamus filed 
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/11/2016Mandate issued 
06/15/2016Letter issued by the court 
06/15/2016Order entered 
06/15/2016Petition for writ of mandamus disposedMotion or Writ Denied
11/20/2015Motion filedGrant motion
11/20/2015Motion for emergency relief disposedMotion or Writ Denied
11/16/2015Motion filed 
11/16/2015Motion to vacate filed 
10/15/2015Reply to response or motion filed 
10/06/2015Amicus curiae brief received 
09/25/2015Amicus curiae brief received 
09/24/2015Letter received 
09/23/2015Order entered 
09/21/2015Motion to vacate filed 
09/16/2015Amicus curiae brief received 
09/16/2015Amicus curiae brief received 
09/15/2015Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
09/14/2015Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
08/14/2015Response filed 
08/14/2015Order enteredGrant motion
08/11/2015Motion filed 
08/11/2015Petition for writ of mandamus received 
08/07/2015Case stored 
08/07/2015Memorandum opinion issuedGrant motion
08/07/2015Retention time case file will be retained 
08/07/2015Motion to stay disposedDismissed as moot
08/07/2015Judgment Issued 
08/07/2015Submitted 
08/07/2015Amicus curiae brief received 
07/31/2015Reply brief filed 
07/30/2015Brief filed - oral argument requested 
07/29/2015Supplemental petition for writ of mandamus filed 
07/24/2015Amicus curiae brief received 
07/24/2015Amicus curiae brief received 
07/16/2015Motion disposedGrant motion
07/16/2015Order enteredGrant motion
07/16/2015Motion disposedDismissed as moot
07/16/2015Order enteredDismissed as moot
07/16/2015Order entered 
07/09/2015Petition for writ of mandamus filed 
07/08/2015Motion filed 
07/08/2015Motion filed 
07/08/2015Certificate of service filed 
07/08/2015Certificate of service filed 
07/08/2015Certificate of service filed 
07/08/2015Appendix filed 
07/08/2015Reporters record filed 
07/07/2015Order entered 
07/02/2015Appendix filed 
07/01/2015Motion to stay filed 
07/01/2015Petition for writ of mandamus filed 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/11/2023Case StoredDestroy 6 yrs after date of final disposition
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas, The State ofReal party in interestAbel Reyna
Gabriel Price
Sterling A. Harmon
Johnson, MattRespondent 
Clendennen, Matthew AlanRelatorF. Clinton Broden
Trial Court Information
54th District Court 
McLennan 
Honorable Matt Johnson 
2015-1955-2 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site