Tenth Court of Appeals

Case: 10-15-00105-CV    
10-15-00105-CV
03/27/2015
Interlocutory
Paul Reed Harper 
The State of Texas ex rel George Darrell Best 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/16/2018Amicus curiae brief received 
12/22/2017Amicus curiae brief received 
06/22/2015Reply brief filedAppellant
06/01/2015Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
05/11/2015Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/16/2018Amicus curiae brief received 
07/10/2018Motion for rehearing filed 
07/02/2018Order enteredAffirmed/Remanded to Trial Ct.
12/22/2017Amicus curiae brief received 
01/23/2017Case forwarded to higher court 
09/27/2016Petition for review filed in Supreme Court 
08/29/2016Motion for extension of time to file petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtGrant motion
08/26/2016Motion for extension of time to file petition for review filed in Supreme Court 
07/13/2016Motion for rehearing deniedMotion or Writ Denied
07/13/2016Order enteredMotion or Writ Denied
06/14/2016Response filed 
06/09/2016Response filed 
05/20/2016Objection filed 
05/19/2016Order entered 
05/17/2016Notice filed 
05/04/2016Motion for rehearing filed 
04/21/2016Retention time case file will be retained 
04/21/2016Judgment Issued 
04/21/2016Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
11/04/2015Submitted 
11/02/2015Supplemental clerks record filed 
10/08/2015Set for submission on oral argument 
06/22/2015Reply brief filed 
06/22/2015Notice filed 
06/01/2015Case ready to be set 
06/01/2015Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
05/11/2015Brief filed - oral argument requested 
04/22/2015Extension of time to file reporters record disposedGrant motion
04/21/2015Reporters record filed 
04/15/2015Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
04/09/2015Supplemental clerks record filed 
04/08/2015Extension of time to file reporters record disposedGrant motion
04/02/2015Clerks record filed 
03/31/2015Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
03/31/2015Docketing statement filed 
03/27/2015Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
03/26/2015Letter received 
03/11/2015Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/03/2016Appeal to Higher CourtHigher court review
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Harper, Paul ReedAppellantDavid B. Dowell
Christopher Brown
Mary H. Barkley
Best, George DarrellAppelleeAndrew W. Lucas
Trial Court Information
249th District Court 
Somervell 
Honorable C.C. Kit Cooke 
C10369 
Robin Howe 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site