Supreme Court

Case: 10-0950    
10-0950
11/19/2010
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
ENBRIDGE PIPELINES (EAST TEXAS) L.P. 
AVINGER TIMBER, LLC 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/13/2012Amended Brief filedPetitionerAmended Brief:  Reply to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Enbridge Pipelines.
12/07/2012Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedRespondentReply to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Avinger Timber LLC.
12/06/2012Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedPetitionerPetitioner Enbridge Pipelines (East Texas) LP’s Response to James B. Ratliff's Amicus Brief supporting Avinger’s Motion for Rehearing.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/04/2012Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedPetitionerPetitioner Enbridge Pipelines (East Texas) LP’s Response to four Amicus Briefs supporting Avinger’s Motion for Rehearing.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
11/30/2012Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae Brief of Amici Curiae Texas Eagle Forum, Grassroots America-We the People, and The Justice Foundation in support of Respondent's Motion for Rehearing submitted by Matthew J. Kita, P.O. Box 5119, Dallas, TX  (214)699-1863.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
11/30/2012Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae Amicus Brief filed on behalf of James B. Ratliff.  Submitted by S.G. Johndroe III, Cantey Hanger LLP, 600 West 6th Street, Suite 300, Ft. Worth, Texas 76102, Telephone: (817)877-2800  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
11/14/2012Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of We Texans and Independent Texans.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
11/14/2012Response to Motion for RehearingPetitionerPetitioner Enbridge Pipelines (East Texas) LP's Response to Avinger's Motion for Rehearing.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
11/08/2012Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of Texas Farm Bureau.  Submitted by Andy McSwain, Fulbright Winniford PC, PO Box 445, Waco, TX, 76703, (254)776-6000.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
11/08/2012Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Brief of Amici Curiae Michelle Jones, Roland Quintana, et al. in support of Rehearing. Submitted by Ryan P. Bates of Yetter Coleman LLP of Austin, Texas. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
10/30/2012Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Letter informs the Court that an Amicus letter will be filed.
10/30/2012Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Letter filed on behalf of Grassroots America We The People and Texas Eagle Forum.
10/29/2012Motion for RehearingRespondent's Motion for Rehearing of Cause filedMotion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Avinger Timber LLC.
05/15/2012Post submission brief filedPetitionerPetitioner's Post-submission Letter Brief filed on behalf of Enbridge Pipelines.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
05/01/2012Post submission brief filedRespondentResponse to Post Submission Brief filed on behalf of Avinger Timber, LLC.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED.
03/21/2012Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of Centerpoint Energy Gas Trasnmission Company, LLC, et al.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED.
03/16/2012Post submission brief filedPetitionerE-FILED  Petitioner Enbridge Pipelines' Post-Submission Brief.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
03/09/2012Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)E-FILED  Brief Amicus Curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation and Texas Landowners' Council in Support of Respondent.  Submitted by Chance Weldon of Pacific Legal Foundation, 930 G Street, Sacramento California 95814, (916) 419-7111.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
02/27/2012Exhibits in case/cause filedPetitionerE-FILED  Petitioner Enbridge's Demonstrative Exhibits for Oral Argument.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
02/24/2012Exhibits in case/cause filedRespondentOral Argument Exhibit filed on behalf of Avinger Timber, LLC.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
02/24/2012Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedRespondentE-FILED Respondent Avinger Timber's Response to Texas Oil & Gas Association's Amicus Brief.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
02/23/2012Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedRespondentResponse to Seven Amicus Briefs filed on behalf of Avinger Timber.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
02/06/2012Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief of Texas Oil & Gas Association.  Submitted by Jeff Avant, Avant & Mitchell LP, 700 Lavaca, Suite 1400, 700 Lavaca, Suite 1400, Phone: (512) 478-5757.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
01/13/2012Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of Texas Land and Mineral Owners Assoc'n submitted by William Christian, Graves Dougherty Hearon & Moody, PC, 401 Congress Ave., Suite 2200, Austin, Texas, 78701. Tel. (512)480-5682.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
01/10/2012Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)E-FILED: Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of Texas Farm Bureau, et al.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/22/2011Reply BriefPetitionerE-FILED: Reply brief on the merits filed on behalf of Enbridge Pipelines (East Texas) L.P.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/20/2011Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)E-FILED  Interstate Natural Gas Association of America's Amicus Curiae Letter Brief in support of Petitioner.  Submitted by Kurt Kuhn of KURT KUHN, PLLC, 101 West Sixth Street Suite 812, Austin Texas, (512) 476-6000. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/19/2011Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)E-FILED: Amicus Curiae Letter filed on behalf of El Paso Electric Company, submitted by Mr. James E. Mann, Duggins Wren Mann & Romero, LLP, P.O. Box 1149, Austin, TX  78767, Phone (512) 744-9300. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
11/07/2011Brief on the MeritsRespondentE-FILED  Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Avinger Timber, LLC.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED.
08/17/2011Brief on the MeritsPetitionerE-FILED: Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Enbridge Pipeline (East Texas) L.P. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
08/01/2011Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief received on behalf of Enterprise Products Partners, L.P. and Energy Transfer Partners. Submitted by Thomas A. Zabel, Zabel Freeman, 420 Heights Blvd., Houston, Texas 77007. (12)
08/01/2011Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)E-FILED  Brief of Amicus Curiae Gas Processors Association in support of Petitioner.  Submitted by Alan Daughtry; 1221 McKinney Suite 4100, Houston Texas 770010, [713] 554-9097. (HARD COPIES RECEIVED)
06/08/2011Response to PetitionRespondentE-FILED  Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Avinger Timber LLC. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
03/31/2011Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus curiae letter brief on behalf of Texas Pipeline Assoc. (TPA) & Texas Municipal League (TML), submitted by Mr. Charles B. McFarland, Joyce, McFarland & McFarland LLP, 712 Main St., Suite 1500, Houston, TX.  77002-3207, Phone (713) 222-1115, Fax (713) 513-5577.  (orig & 11)
03/14/2011Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Received on behalf of TransCanada Keystone Pipeline and submitted by Steven K. Carroll, Fulbright & Jaworski L.L.P., 1301 McKinney, Suite 5100, Houston, Texas, 77010, (713) 651-5151. (12)
03/01/2011Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Received on behalf of Crosstex Energy Services, L.P. and submitted by Lewis L. Isaacks, Gay, McCall, Isaacs, Gordon & Roberts, P.C., 777 East 15th Street, Plano, Texas 75074, (972) 424-8501. (12)
02/09/2011Appendix FiledPetitionerAppendix attached.
02/09/2011Petition for ReviewPetitionerOn behalf of Enbridge Pipeline (East Texas) L.P.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/21/2014Case Stored - stored case location updated Row 11 F-5
12/21/2012Case Stored G02 Row 21 D-3 (9 vols)
12/14/2012Mandate issued Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
12/14/2012Motion for Rehearing - DisposedDenied with Justice not sitting. 
12/13/2012Amended Brief filed Amended Brief:  Reply to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Enbridge Pipelines.
12/07/2012Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed Reply to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Avinger Timber LLC.
12/06/2012Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed Petitioner Enbridge Pipelines (East Texas) LP’s Response to James B. Ratliff's Amicus Brief supporting Avinger’s Motion for Rehearing.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/04/2012Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed Petitioner Enbridge Pipelines (East Texas) LP’s Response to four Amicus Briefs supporting Avinger’s Motion for Rehearing.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
11/30/2012Amicus Curiae Brief received Brief of Amici Curiae Texas Eagle Forum, Grassroots America-We the People, and The Justice Foundation in support of Respondent's Motion for Rehearing submitted by Matthew J. Kita, P.O. Box 5119, Dallas, TX  (214)699-1863.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
11/30/2012Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief filed on behalf of James B. Ratliff.  Submitted by S.G. Johndroe III, Cantey Hanger LLP, 600 West 6th Street, Suite 300, Ft. Worth, Texas 76102, Telephone: (817)877-2800  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
11/15/2012Address Change  Respondent Avinger's Co-Counsel, Chris Johns' Notice of Change of Address.
11/14/2012Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of We Texans and Independent Texans.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
11/14/2012Response to Motion for Rehearing Petitioner Enbridge Pipelines (East Texas) LP's Response to Avinger's Motion for Rehearing.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
11/08/2012Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of Texas Farm Bureau.  Submitted by Andy McSwain, Fulbright Winniford PC, PO Box 445, Waco, TX, 76703, (254)776-6000.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
11/08/2012Amicus Curiae Brief received Brief of Amici Curiae Michelle Jones, Roland Quintana, et al. in support of Rehearing. Submitted by Ryan P. Bates of Yetter Coleman LLP of Austin, Texas. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
10/31/2012Letter Filed Letter informs the Court that an Amicus Brief will be filed by November 7, 2012.
10/30/2012Amicus Curiae Letter Received Letter informs the Court that an Amicus letter will be filed.
10/30/2012Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Curiae Letter filed on behalf of Grassroots America We The People and Texas Eagle Forum.
10/30/2012Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to motion for rehearing due no later than 11/14/12.
10/29/2012Case forwarded to Court  
10/29/2012Motion for Rehearing Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Avinger Timber LLC.
10/16/2012Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedMotion for Rehearing due 10/29/12. NO FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE CONSIDERED.
10/12/2012Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Enbridge Pipelines, L.P.
09/10/2012Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedMotion for Rehearing due 10/17/12.
09/07/2012Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Enbridge Pipeline (East Texas) L.P.
08/31/2012Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
08/31/2012Dissenting opinion issued.IssuedJustice Johnson delivered a dissenting opinion, in which Justice Green and Justice Willett joined.
08/31/2012Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed; cause remanded to trial courtJustice Lehrmann delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Chief Justice Jefferson, Justice Hecht, Justice Wainwright, Justice Medina, and Justice Guzman joined.
05/15/2012Post submission brief filed Petitioner's Post-submission Letter Brief filed on behalf of Enbridge Pipelines.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
05/01/2012Post submission brief filed Response to Post Submission Brief filed on behalf of Avinger Timber, LLC.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED.
03/21/2012Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of Centerpoint Energy Gas Trasnmission Company, LLC, et al.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED.
03/16/2012Post submission brief filed E-FILED  Petitioner Enbridge Pipelines' Post-Submission Brief.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
03/09/2012Amicus Curiae Brief received E-FILED  Brief Amicus Curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation and Texas Landowners' Council in Support of Respondent.  Submitted by Chance Weldon of Pacific Legal Foundation, 930 G Street, Sacramento California 95814, (916) 419-7111.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
02/27/2012Oral argument  argued on behalf of petitioner by Stephen G. Tipps, Lauren Tanner, and Thomas R. Phillips; argued on behalf of respondent by Glenn Sodd, Jason Sodd, and Mike A. Hatchell
02/27/2012Exhibits in case/cause filed E-FILED  Petitioner Enbridge's Demonstrative Exhibits for Oral Argument.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
02/24/2012Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.Filing granted Petitioner Enbridge Pipelines (East Texas) L.P. and Respondent Avinger Timber LLC's JOINT Motion requesting Additional Seating at Counsel Tables at Oral Argument granted
02/24/2012Exhibits in case/cause filed Oral Argument Exhibit filed on behalf of Avinger Timber, LLC.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
02/24/2012Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed E-FILED Respondent Avinger Timber's Response to Texas Oil & Gas Association's Amicus Brief.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
02/24/2012Miscellaneous Motion E-FILED  Petitioner Enbridge Pipelines (East Texas) L.P. and Respondent Avinger Timber LLC's JOINT Motion requesting Additional Seating at Counsel Tables at Oral Argument
02/23/2012Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed Response to Seven Amicus Briefs filed on behalf of Avinger Timber.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
02/06/2012Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief of Texas Oil & Gas Association.  Submitted by Jeff Avant, Avant & Mitchell LP, 700 Lavaca, Suite 1400, 700 Lavaca, Suite 1400, Phone: (512) 478-5757.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
02/02/2012Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received E-FILED OA submission form submitted by petitioner attorney Stephen G. Tipps of Baker Botts LLP of Houston Texas.
02/01/2012Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received OA submission form submitted by respondent attorney Glenn Sodd of Dawson & Sodd, LLP of Corsicana, TX
01/27/2012Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentSet for oral argument on 2/27/12; time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
01/27/2012Petition for Review granted  
01/27/2012Petition for Review disposedFiling granted 
01/13/2012Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of Texas Land and Mineral Owners Assoc'n submitted by William Christian, Graves Dougherty Hearon & Moody, PC, 401 Congress Ave., Suite 2200, Austin, Texas, 78701. Tel. (512)480-5682.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
01/10/2012Amicus Curiae Brief received E-FILED: Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of Texas Farm Bureau, et al.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/22/2011Reply Brief E-FILED: Reply brief on the merits filed on behalf of Enbridge Pipelines (East Texas) L.P.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/20/2011Amicus Curiae Letter Received E-FILED  Interstate Natural Gas Association of America's Amicus Curiae Letter Brief in support of Petitioner.  Submitted by Kurt Kuhn of KURT KUHN, PLLC, 101 West Sixth Street Suite 812, Austin Texas, (512) 476-6000. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
12/19/2011Amicus Curiae Letter Received E-FILED: Amicus Curiae Letter filed on behalf of El Paso Electric Company, submitted by Mr. James E. Mann, Duggins Wren Mann & Romero, LLP, P.O. Box 1149, Austin, TX  78767, Phone (512) 744-9300. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
11/16/2011Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief is granted.  Reply Brief is due on December 22, 2012.  FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE CONSIDERED.
11/10/2011Address Change  Counsel for Respondent, Mr. Chris John's change of address.  Updated in CMS. On behalf of Avinger Timber LLC.
11/09/2011Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed E-FILED  Unopposed motion for extension of time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Enbridge Pipeline.
11/07/2011Brief on the Merits E-FILED  Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Avinger Timber, LLC.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED.
09/27/2011Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing granted Unopposed Second  Motion for Extension of Time to file Brief on the Merits granted.  Response brief due 11/7/11; Reply brief due 11/22/11.  Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored.
09/26/2011Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed E-FILED  Unopposed Second  Motion for Extension of Time to file Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Avinger Timber.
09/02/2011Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing granted Respondent Avinger Timber LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits granted.  Response brief due 10/6/11; Reply brief due 10/21/11. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored.
08/30/2011Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed E-FILED  Respondent Avinger Timber LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response Brief on the Merits. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
08/18/2011Letter Received From pet's atty, Mr. Stephen G. Tipps, making a correction to petitioner's name.  It should be Enbridge PIPELINES (East Texas) L.P., and not ENBRIDGE PIPELINE. (orig)
08/17/2011Brief on the Merits E-FILED: Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Enbridge Pipeline (East Texas) L.P. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
08/01/2011Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief received on behalf of Enterprise Products Partners, L.P. and Energy Transfer Partners. Submitted by Thomas A. Zabel, Zabel Freeman, 420 Heights Blvd., Houston, Texas 77007. (12)
08/01/2011Amicus Curiae Brief received E-FILED  Brief of Amicus Curiae Gas Processors Association in support of Petitioner.  Submitted by Alan Daughtry; 1221 McKinney Suite 4100, Houston Texas 770010, [713] 554-9097. (HARD COPIES RECEIVED)
06/28/2011Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed motion for extension of time to file petitioner's brief on the merits is granted.   Petitioner's brief is due no later than 3:00 pm, August 17, 2011; Response brief is due September 6, 2011, and the Reply brief is due September 21, 2011 .  Mailbox rule does not apply.   Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored.
06/23/2011Case Record Filed  Clerk's record (8V- V8- Exhibits), supp clk's record (2 V), reporter's record (8V), supp reporter's record (1V), reporter's record (3 V & 2 binder exhibits), ant's br, ape's br, ant's reply br, amicus br of Tx. Pipeline Assoc., amicus br of Gas Processors Assoc., amicus br of El Paso Electric Co., surreply of ape, misc. folder (mos., orders & corres.), opinion judgment
06/22/2011Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed E-FILED  Unopposed motion for extension of time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits. On behalf of Enbridge Pipeline (East Texas), LP. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
06/20/2011Record Requested in Petition for Review  
06/17/2011Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than 3:00 p.m. on 7/18/11; Response brief due 8/8/11; Reply brief due 8/23/11; mailbox rule does not apply
06/08/2011Response to Petition E-FILED  Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Avinger Timber LLC. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
05/06/2011Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed motion for extension of time to file requested response to petition for review due no later than 3:00 p.m. on 6/8/11; mailbox rule does not apply.  Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored.
05/03/2011Motion for Extension of Time to File Response E-FILED  Unopposed motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review. On behalf of Avinger Timber, LLC. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
04/08/2011Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than 3:00 p.m. on 5/9/11; mailbox rule does not apply if filing by paper
03/31/2011Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus curiae letter brief on behalf of Texas Pipeline Assoc. (TPA) & Texas Municipal League (TML), submitted by Mr. Charles B. McFarland, Joyce, McFarland & McFarland LLP, 712 Main St., Suite 1500, Houston, TX.  77002-3207, Phone (713) 222-1115, Fax (713) 513-5577.  (orig & 11)
03/14/2011Amicus Curiae Brief received Received on behalf of TransCanada Keystone Pipeline and submitted by Steven K. Carroll, Fulbright & Jaworski L.L.P., 1301 McKinney, Suite 5100, Houston, Texas, 77010, (713) 651-5151. (12)
03/08/2011Case forwarded to Court  
03/04/2011Response Waiver filed Filed on behalf of Avinger Timber LLC. (12)
03/01/2011Amicus Curiae Letter Received Received on behalf of Crosstex Energy Services, L.P. and submitted by Lewis L. Isaacks, Gay, McCall, Isaacs, Gordon & Roberts, P.C., 777 East 15th Street, Plano, Texas 75074, (972) 424-8501. (12)
02/09/2011Appendix Filed Appendix attached.
02/09/2011Petition for Review On behalf of Enbridge Pipeline (East Texas) L.P.
12/15/2010Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedPetition is due February 9, 2010.  Further requests for extension of time for this filing will be disfavored
12/13/2010Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed motion for extension of time to file petition (2) filed on behalf of Enbridge Pipeline.
11/23/2010Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedPetition due January 12, 2011
11/19/2010Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed motion for extension of time to file Petition for Review. On behalf of Enbridge Pipeline (East Texas), LP. (3)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
05/21/2014Case StoredCase stored.Row 11 F-5
12/21/2012Case StoredCase stored.G02 Row 21 D-3 (9 vols)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jones, MichelleAmicus CuriaeMr. Ryan Parker Bates
Enbridge Pipeline (East Texas) LPPetitionerMr. Eric Wayne Doerries
Mr. Thomas H. Buchanan
Mr. Stephen G. Tipps
Ms. Lauren Tanner Bradley
Mr. Thomas E. Sheffield
Mr. Thomas R. Phillips
Pacific Legal FoundationAmicus CuriaeMr. Chance Dean Weldon
Texas Farm BureauAmicus CuriaeMr. Douglas G. Caroom
Ms. Emily Willms Rogers
El Paso Electric CompanyAmicus CuriaeMr. James E. Mann
Mr. Patrick Joseph Pearsall
Enterprise Products Partners, L.P.Amicus CuriaeMr. Thomas A. Zabel
Interstate Natural Gas Association of AmericaAmicus CuriaeMr. Kurt H. Kuhn
Avinger Timber LLCRespondentMr. Charles R. 'Skip' Watson Jr.
Mr. William Jason Sodd
Ms. Jody Sodd McSpadden
Mr. Clay Beard
Mr. John R. Mercy
Mr. Mike A. Hatchell
Mr. Glenn A. Sodd
Mr. Christopher S. Johns
Texas Farm BureauAmicus CuriaeMr. Andy McSwain
Transcanada Keystone Pipeline, L.P.Amicus CuriaeMr. Stephen K. Carroll
Mr. Jeffery Frank Nadalo
Texas Land and Mineral Owners Assoc'nAmicus CuriaeMr. William Gerow Christian
Texas Oil & Gas Assoc'nAmicus CuriaeMr. Jeff Avant
Texas Pipeline Association and Texas Municipal LeagueAmicus CuriaeMr. Charles B. McFarland
Centerpoint Energy Gas Transmission Company, LLCAmicus CuriaeMr. Thomas J. Forestier
We Texans and Independent TexansAmicus CuriaeMr. Ryan Hedley Downton
Grassroots America We the PeopleAmicus CuriaeMr. Matthew J. Kita
Ratliff, JamesAmicus CuriaeMr. S. G. Johndroe III
Gas Processors AssociationAmicus CuriaeMr. Alan B. Daughtry
Crosstex Energy Services, L.P.Amicus CuriaeMr. Lewis L. Isaacks
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed [duplicate 3] 
326 SW3d 390, 10-27-10 
6th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Jack Carter 
Trial Court Information
276th District Court 
Marion 
Honorable William Reed Porter 
0400066 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site