Supreme Court

Case: 10-0775    
10-0775
09/22/2010
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
SUSAN ELAINE BOSTIC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE HEIRS AND ESTATE OF TIMOTHY SHAWN BOSTIC, DECEASED; HELEN DONNAHOE; AND KYLE ANTHONY BOSTIC 
GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/05/2013Post submission brief filedRespondentRespondent's post-submission letter brief filed on behalf of Georgia-Pacific.
09/30/2013Response to Brief filedPetitionerPetitioner's Response Part 2 to Georgia-Pacific Corp.'s Post-Submission Letter Brief filed on behalf of Susan Elaine Bostic, et al.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED.
09/17/2013Letter brief PetitionerPost-Submission Letter Brief filed on behalf of Susan Elaine Bostic, et al. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/16/2013Post submission brief filedRespondentPost-Submission Letter Brief filed on behalf of Georgia-Pacific Corp.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/09/2013Exhibits in case/cause filedPetitionerPetitioners' Oral Argument Exhibits. On behalf of Susan Elaine Bostic, et al. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/04/2013Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Brief of Amicus Curiae Union Carbide Corp., and Kelly-Moore Paint Co., Inc. in support of Respondent. Submitted by Macey Reasoner Stokes of Baker Botts LLP of Houston TX and Kay Andrews of Hawkins Parnell Thackston & Young LLP of Austin TX.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/03/2013Supplemental Brief filedPetitionerReply to Georgia-Pacifiic's Supplemental Brief filed on behalf of Susan Elaine Bostic.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED.
08/22/2013Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of  American Coatings Assoc'n, Inc., American Chemistry Council, and Int'l Assoc'n of Defense Counsel.  Submitted by RICHARD O. FAULK, TEXAS BAR NO. 06854300, HOLLINGSWORTH LLP, 1350 I St., N.W., Washington, D.C. 20005, (202) 898-5843.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
08/21/2013Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief of Coalition for Litigation Justice, Inc., et al.  Submitted by Manuel López (Bar No. 00784495), SHOOK, HARDY & BACON L.L.P., JP Morgan Chase Tower, 600 Travis Street, Suite 3400, Houston, TX 77002, Tel: (713) 227-8008  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
08/20/2013Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief in support of Respondent Georgia-Pacific Corp. filed on behalf of Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
08/20/2013Supplemental Brief filedRespondentSupplemental Brief filed on behalf of Georgia-Pacific Corp.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
08/19/2013Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
08/19/2013Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Letter of Texas Civil Justice League. Submitted by George S. Christian of TCJL of Austin Texas. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
06/17/2013Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of Pacific Legal Foundation, Mr. J. David Breemer, 930 G Street, Sacramento, CA.  95814, Phone (916) 419-7111, Fax (916) 419-7747. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
02/15/2013Petition Reinstated  
01/17/2013Supplemental Letter BriefPetitionerSecond Supplemental Letter Brief filed on behalf of Susan Bostic, et al. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
01/11/2013Supplemental Letter BriefPetitionerSupplemental Letter Brief for Petitioners’ Motion for Rehearing. On behalf of Susan Elaine Bostic, et al.  (HARD COPIES REC"D)
12/12/2012Motion for RehearingRehearing filed in Petition for ReviewMotion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Susan Elaine Bostic.
12/05/2011Reply BriefPetitionerE-FILED  Petitioner Susan Elaine Bostic's Reply Brief on the Merits. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
10/19/2011Brief on the MeritsRespondentE-FILED: Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Georgia-Pacific Corporation. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
06/29/2011Brief on the MeritsPetitionerE-FILED  Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Susan Elaine Bostic. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
04/08/2011Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Susan Elaine Bostic, et al. (12)
03/21/2011Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to petition (12) filed on behalf of Georgie-Pacific Corporation.
11/12/2010Appendix FiledPetitionerattached to petition
11/12/2010Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition appendix attached (12) filed on behalf of Susan Elaine Bostic.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/12/2014Case Stored G02 Exhibit Room H-5 (4 vols + 2 boxes)
08/22/2014Mandate issued Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
07/11/2014Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
07/11/2014Dissenting opinion issued.IssuedJustice Lehrmann filed a dissenting opinion, in which Justice Boyd and Justice Devine joined.
07/11/2014Concurring Opinion issued.IssuedJustice Guzman delivered a concurring opinion.
07/11/2014Opinion issuedCourt of appeals' judgment affirmedThe Court affirms the court of appeals' judgment.  Justice Willett delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Chief Justice Hecht, Justice Green, Justice Johnson, and Justice Brown joined, and in all but Parts II.A.3 and II.B of which Justice Guzman joined.
(7/11/2014 11:21:19 AM) 10-0775.jmt.pdf, 100775d.pdf, 100775c.pdf, 100775.pdf
04/03/2014Notice from Counsel of a change in address Notice of change of address for James M. Beck counsel for Amicus Curiae Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc.
11/05/2013Post submission brief filed Respondent's post-submission letter brief filed on behalf of Georgia-Pacific.
09/30/2013Response to Brief filed Petitioner's Response Part 2 to Georgia-Pacific Corp.'s Post-Submission Letter Brief filed on behalf of Susan Elaine Bostic, et al.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED.
09/24/2013Call received Petitioner's counsel called to say that she would be filing a post submission brief on Monday, September 30, 2013. The brief was delayed due to her recent wedding ceremony.
09/17/2013Letter brief  Post-Submission Letter Brief filed on behalf of Susan Elaine Bostic, et al. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/16/2013Post submission brief filed Post-Submission Letter Brief filed on behalf of Georgia-Pacific Corp.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/12/2013Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion in Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion from Richard O. Faulk in support of Thomas J. Graves filed on behalf of American Coatings Association, Inc has been granted.
09/12/2013Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion in Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion from Richard O. Faulk in support of Donald D. Evans filed on behalf of American Chemistry Council has been granted.
09/12/2013Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Donald D. Evans filed on behalf of American Chemistry Council has been granted.
09/12/2013Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Thomas J. Graves filed on behalf of American Coatings Association, Inc. has been granted.
09/12/2013Pro hac vice motion filed Motion in Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion from Richard O. Faulk in support of Thomas J. Graves filed on behalf of American Coatings Association, Inc.
09/12/2013Pro hac vice motion filed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Thomas J. Graves filed on behalf of American Coatings Association, Inc.
09/12/2013Pro hac vice motion filed Motion in Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion from Richard O. Faulk in support of Donald D. Evans filed on behalf of American Chemistry Council.
09/12/2013Pro hac vice motion filed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Donald D. Evans filed on behalf of American Chemistry Council.
09/12/2013Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion is Support of Eric G. Lasker's Pro Hac Vice Motion is granted.
09/12/2013Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion for Pro Hac Vice Admission for Eric G. Lasker is granted.
09/12/2013Pro hac vice motion filed Motion in Support of Admission Pro Hac Vice of Eric G. Lasker.
09/12/2013Phone call from Clerk's Office Left message with Robert Faulk asking him to file a motion in support of pro hac vice for Eric G. Lasker.
09/12/2013Pro hac vice motion filed Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Eric G. Lasker.
09/09/2013Oral argument  Argued on behalf of Petitioners by Denyse Clancy; Argued on behalf of Respondents by Deborah G. Hankinson (Chief Justice Jefferson not sitting)
09/09/2013Exhibits in case/cause filed Petitioners' Oral Argument Exhibits. On behalf of Susan Elaine Bostic, et al. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/04/2013Amicus Curiae Brief received Brief of Amicus Curiae Union Carbide Corp., and Kelly-Moore Paint Co., Inc. in support of Respondent. Submitted by Macey Reasoner Stokes of Baker Botts LLP of Houston TX and Kay Andrews of Hawkins Parnell Thackston & Young LLP of Austin TX.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/03/2013Supplemental Brief filed Reply to Georgia-Pacifiic's Supplemental Brief filed on behalf of Susan Elaine Bostic.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED.
08/28/2013Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion in Support of Stuart Raphael's Pro Hac Vice Motion granted.
08/28/2013Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion for Pro Hac Vice Admission for Stuart A. Raphael granted.
08/26/2013Pro hac vice motion filed Motion in Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion from Richard B. Phillips in support of Stuart A. Raphael, Jr. filed on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc.
08/26/2013Pro hac vice motion filed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Stuart A. Raphael filed on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc.
08/26/2013Electronic communication sent to Party Messaged Richard Faulk to request Motions for Pro Hac Vice for Donald Evans, Eric Lasker, and Thomas Graves.
08/22/2013Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of  American Coatings Assoc'n, Inc., American Chemistry Council, and Int'l Assoc'n of Defense Counsel.  Submitted by RICHARD O. FAULK, TEXAS BAR NO. 06854300, HOLLINGSWORTH LLP, 1350 I St., N.W., Washington, D.C. 20005, (202) 898-5843.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
08/22/2013Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for James M. Beck filed on behalf of the Product Liability Advisory Council has been granted.
08/21/2013Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion in Support of Sheldon Gilbert's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Manuel Lopez is granted.
08/21/2013Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sheldon Gilbert is granted.
08/21/2013Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion in support of William Anderson's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Manuel Lopez is granted.
08/21/2013Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William Anderson is granted.
08/21/2013Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion in Support of Mark Behrens' Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Manuel Lopez is granted.
08/21/2013Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark Behrens is granted.
08/21/2013Pro hac vice motion filed Motion in Support of Mark Behrens by Manuel Lopez.  INCORPORATED WITH Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark Behrens.
08/21/2013Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion to admit James M. Beck Pro Hac Vice granted.
08/21/2013Pro hac vice motion filed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James M. Beck on behalf of Product Liability Advisory Council.
08/21/2013Pro hac vice motion filed Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mark Behrens.  INCORPORATED WITH Motion in Support of Manuel Lopez.
08/21/2013Pro hac vice motion filed Motion in Support of Sheldon Gilbert by Manuel Lopez.  INCORPORATED WITH Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sheldon Gilbert.
08/21/2013Pro hac vice motion filed Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sheldon Gilbert.  INCORPORATED WITH Motion in Support of Manuel Lopez.
08/21/2013Electronic communication sent to Party Ms. Clancy and Ms. Hankinson informed the Court that the Motions for Pro Hac Vice are unopposed.
08/21/2013Pro hac vice motion filed Motion in Support of William Anderson by Manuel Lopez.  INCORPORATED WITH Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William Anderson.
08/21/2013Pro hac vice motion filed Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William Anderson.  INCORPORATED WITH Motion in Support of Manuel Lopez.
08/21/2013Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief of Coalition for Litigation Justice, Inc., et al.  Submitted by Manuel López (Bar No. 00784495), SHOOK, HARDY & BACON L.L.P., JP Morgan Chase Tower, 600 Travis Street, Suite 3400, Houston, TX 77002, Tel: (713) 227-8008  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
08/21/2013Pro hac vice motion filed Motion in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for James M. Beck filed on behalf of the Product Liability Advisory Council.
08/20/2013Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief in support of Respondent Georgia-Pacific Corp. filed on behalf of Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
08/20/2013Supplemental Brief filed Supplemental Brief filed on behalf of Georgia-Pacific Corp.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
08/20/2013Call received Respondent attorney, Rick Thompson, called to inform the Court that they filed a supplemental brief on behalf of Georgie-Pacific Corporation.  Informed Mr. Thompson that the brief will be circulated to the Court for review prior to oral argument.  
08/19/2013Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
08/19/2013Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus Curiae Letter of Texas Civil Justice League. Submitted by George S. Christian of TCJL of Austin Texas. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
06/27/2013Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion in Support of Motion to Admit Deborah J. La Fetra Pro Hac Vice Granted.
06/27/2013Pro hac vice motion disposedFiling grantedMotion to Admit Deborah J. La Fetra Pro Hac Vice granted.
06/26/2013Pro hac vice motion filed Motion in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Deborah J. La Fetra filed on behalf of Pacific Legal Foundation.
06/26/2013Pro hac vice motion filed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Deborah J. La Fetra filed on behalf of Pacific Legal Foundation.
06/18/2013Phone call from Clerk's Office Left message for attorney Breemer to file the requisite motion for pro hac vice admission.
06/17/2013Phone call from Clerk's Office Left message for Attorney Breemer to file the appropriate pro hac vice motions for out of state attorney La Fetra.
06/17/2013Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Curiae Brief filed on behalf of Pacific Legal Foundation, Mr. J. David Breemer, 930 G Street, Sacramento, CA.  95814, Phone (916) 419-7111, Fax (916) 419-7747. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
06/10/2013Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument will be presented by Denyse Clancy of Baron & Budd, P.C., 3102 Oak Lawn Avenue, Suite 1100, Dallas, Texas 75219, 214-521-3605.
05/14/2013Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument will be presented by Deborah G. Hankinson on behalf of Georgia Pacific Corp.
05/03/2013Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis cause has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., September 9, 2013.
02/15/2013Call received Deborah Hankinson called the clerk's office to inform the Court that the motion for rehearing was granted without requesting a response in contravention of Tex. R. App. P. 64.3, which states that a motion for rehearing "will not be granted unless a response has been filed or requested by the Court." Also to inform the Court of vacation letter to be filed.
02/15/2013Notice from attorney regarding vacation dates Deborah Hankinson's Vacation Notice:  February 28-March 18, 2013.  Remainder of March reserved for mediation at the request of Hon. Steve Smith, 361st District Court of Brazos County.
02/15/2013Petition for Review granted  
02/15/2013Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedDate and time of oral argument are yet to be determined.
02/15/2013Petition Reinstated  
02/15/2013Motion for Rehearing - DisposedFiling granted 
02/15/2013Previous Order of the Court withdrawn denial of petition for review on 10/26/12 withdrawn
01/17/2013Supplemental Letter Brief Second Supplemental Letter Brief filed on behalf of Susan Bostic, et al. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
01/11/2013Supplemental Letter Brief Supplemental Letter Brief for Petitioners’ Motion for Rehearing. On behalf of Susan Elaine Bostic, et al.  (HARD COPIES REC"D)
12/18/2012Case forwarded to Court  
12/12/2012Motion for Rehearing Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Susan Elaine Bostic.
11/12/2012Letter Filed Letter informs the Court of the new address for Mr. Raul Calderon:  Attorney at Law, 700 Louisiana, Suite 1850, Houston, Texas 77057.
11/07/2012Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Rehearing is granted. Motion for Rehearing is due December 12, 2012. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
11/06/2012Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing Petitioners Susan Elaine Bostic, et al.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing.
10/26/2012Petition for Review disposedDeniedChief Justice Jefferson and Justice Lehrmann note their dissent to the denial of the petition for review.
12/05/2011Reply Brief E-FILED  Petitioner Susan Elaine Bostic's Reply Brief on the Merits. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
11/02/2011Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief on the Merits granted.  Petitioners' Reply Brief is due December 5, 2011. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED
10/26/2011Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed E-FILED  Petitioners' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief on the Merits.  On behalf of Susan Elaine Bostic, et al.
10/19/2011Brief on the Merits E-FILED: Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Georgia-Pacific Corporation. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
09/13/2011Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedRespondent Georgia Pacific Corporation's Unopposed 3rd Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Brief on the Merits granted.  Response brief due 10/19/11; Reply brief due 11/3/11.  No further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored.
09/09/2011Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed E-FILED  Respondent Georgia Pacific Corporation's Unopposed 3rd Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Brief on the Merits. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
08/17/2011Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedRespondent's Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Brief on the Merits granted. Response brief due no later than 3:00 p.m. on 9/19/11; Reply brief due 10/4/11; mailbox rule does not apply.  No further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored.
08/15/2011Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed EFILED  Respondent's Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Georgia-Pacific Corp.  (HARD COPIES REC'D)
07/12/2011Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits granted.  Response brief due no later than 3:00 p.m. on 8/18/11; Reply brief due 9/2/11; mailbox rule does not apply.  Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored.
07/08/2011Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed E-FILED  Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits.  On behalf of Georgia-Pacific Corp. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
06/29/2011Brief on the Merits E-FILED  Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Susan Elaine Bostic. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
06/02/2011Case Record Filed  CLKS REC (5) VOLS, SUPP CLKS REC (2) VOLS,  REPS REC (9) VOLS, EXHIBITS (18) VOLS, ANTS BR, APES BR, ANTS REPLY BR, ANTS O/A BENCH VOL,  MISC FOLDER, JUDGEMENT, OPINION (RV/RN), COPY OF OPINION IN M-F
05/18/2011Description of document returned to Supreme Court Letter to Ms. Dawn Marie Wright - resent letter to correct address on 5/24/11.
05/16/2011Letter Filed Letter from Ms. Tammy Holt Cole to inform the Court that she is no longer an attorney of record for Ford Motor Co. (orig & 1)
05/13/2011Description of document returned to Supreme Court Letter to atty Dawn Marie Wright for other, Ford Motor Co.  Called their office and obtained correct address and remailed.
05/09/2011Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedPetitioner's unopposed motion for extension of time to file briefing on the merits granted.  Petitioner's brief due no later than 3:00 p.m. on 6/29/11; Response brief due 7/19/11; Reply brief due 8/3/11; mailbox rule does not apply if filing by paper; Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored.
05/04/2011Record Requested in Petition for Review  
05/02/2011Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed E-FILED: Petitioner's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Briefing on the Merits on behalf of Susan Elaine Bostic, et al.  (HARD COPIES RECEIVED)
04/29/2011Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than 3:00 p.m. on 5/31/11; Response brief due 6/20/11; Reply brief due 7/5/11; mailbox rule does not apply
04/08/2011Reply to Response Reply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Susan Elaine Bostic, et al. (12)
03/22/2011Phone call from Clerk's Office Verified with Rick Thompson that there are no known attorneys for 3M Company, and Johns-Manville.
03/21/2011Response to Petition Response to petition (12) filed on behalf of Georgie-Pacific Corporation.
03/03/2011Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedRespondent's unopposed motion for extension of time to file response to petition for review granted.  Requested response to petition due no later than 3:00 p.m. on 3/21/11; mailbox rule does not apply.  Further requests for extensions of time will not be considered.
03/02/2011Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed motion for extension of time to file response (2) filed on behalf of Georgia Pacific Corp.
02/01/2011Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedRespondent's unopposed second motion for extension of time to file response to petition for review granted.  Requested response due no later than 3:00 p.m. on 3/4/11; mailbox rule does not apply.  Further requests for extensions of time will not be considered.
01/28/2011Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Second unopposed motion for extension of time to file response to petition for review. On behalf of Georgia Pacific Corporation. (2)
12/27/2010Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedRespondent's unopposed motion for extension of time to file response to petition for review granted.  Requested response to petition for review due no later than 3:00 p.m. on 2/2/11; mailbox rule does not apply.  Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored.
12/22/2010Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed motion for extension of time to file response to petition for review. On behalf of Georgia Pacific Corporation. (2)
12/03/2010Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than 3:00 p.m. on 1/3/11; mailbox rule does not apply
11/23/2010Case forwarded to Court  
11/16/2010Response Waiver filed Response waiver to petition for review filed on behalf of Georgia-Pacific Corp. (orig & 4)
11/12/2010Appendix Filed attached to petition
11/12/2010Petition for Review Petition appendix attached (12) filed on behalf of Susan Elaine Bostic.
09/24/2010Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedPetitioner's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Petition for Review granted.  Petition due 11/9/10
09/22/2010Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed motion for extension of time to file petition (2) filed on behalf of Susan Elaine Bostic.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
09/12/2014Case StoredCase stored.G02 Exhibit Room H-5 (4 vols + 2 boxes)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Anchor Hocking, Inc.Other interested party Ms. Nancy Bell Scales
Crane Co.Other interested party Mr. Charles Josef Blanchard
Pacific Legal FoundationAmicus CuriaeMr. J. David Breemer
Ms. Deborah J. La Fetra
Ingersoll-Rand Co.Other interested party Ms. Laura A. Frase
Mr. Kyle C. Steele
Johns-ManvilleOther interested party  
Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc.Amicus CuriaeMs. Kay Andrews
Honeywell International, Inc.Amicus CuriaeStuart A. Raphael
Mr. Richard B. Phillips Jr.
Guard-Line, Inc.Other interested party Mr. Robert W. Wilkinson
3M CompanyOther interested party  
Rapid American Corp.Other interested party Mr. Joseph Blizzard
Daimler Chrysler Corp.Other interested party Mr. Robert E. Thackston
Babcock Borsig Power, Inc.Other interested party Mr. Gary D. Elliston
Mr. Paul Edward Hamilton
Ms. Jennifer Judin
Foster WheelerOther interested party Mr. James R. Old Jr.
Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc.Amicus CuriaeMs. Ruth G. Malinas
James M. Beck
Bostic, Susan ElainePetitionerMr. John Lacoste Langdoc
Mr. Christopher J. Panatier
Ms. Charla G. Aldous
Ms. Denyse Ronan Clancy
Mr. Michael Shane Mills
Mr. Eric Asher Policastro
Christine Tamer  
Henry Vogt Machine Co.Other interested party Mr. J. Frank Kinsel Jr.
Coalition for Litigation Justice, Inc.Amicus CuriaeMr. Manuel Lopez  
Mid-Valley, Inc.Other interested party Mr. Jack Thomas Jamison
Champlain Cable Co.Other interested party Mr. Raul Calderon
Garlock, Inc.Other interested party Mr. Raymond P. 'Ray' Harris Jr.
Maremont Corp.Other interested party Mr. Jeffrey Luke Larson
Ms. Jill McCarthy Arntz
Ford Motor Co.Other interested party Ms. Dawn Marie Wright
Ms. Tammy Michelle Holt
Union Carbide CorporationAmicus CuriaeMs. Macey Reasoner Stokes
Ms. Sharla J. Frost
American Coatings Association, Inc.Amicus CuriaeDonald D. Evans
Mr. Richard O. Faulk
Thomas J. Graves
Aqua-Chem Congoleum Corp.Other interested party Mr. Clay M. White
Garlock Sealing Technologies, LLCOther interested party Ms. Laurel A. Fay
General RefractoriesOther interested party Mr. W. Neil Rambin
Texas Civil Justice LeagueAmicus CuriaeMr. George S. Christian
Asten Johnson, Inc.Other interested party Mr. Robert Mark Willingham
Amtek, Inc.Other interested party Ms. Karen K. Maston
Georgia-Pacific CorporationRespondentMs. Deborah G. Hankinson
Mr. Melvin David Bailey
Ms. Katherine Mary Warne Ross
Mr. William Richard (Rick) Thompson II
Mr. James Bachman Greer
Court of Appeals Information:
Reverse & Render 
320 SW3d 588, 08-26-10 
5th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Robert M. Fillmore 
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 1 
Dallas 
Honorable D'Metria Benson 
CC-03-01977-A 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site