Supreme Court

Case: 10-0605    
10-0605
08/11/2010
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
IN RE COMMITMENT OF MICHAEL BOHANNAN 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/06/2012Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedPetitionerPetitioner's Reply to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of State of Texas.
11/01/2012Response to Motion for RehearingPetitionerResponse to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of the State of Texas. (hc rec'd)
09/14/2012Motion for RehearingRespondent's Motion for Rehearing of Cause filedMotion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Michael Bohannan.
12/14/2011Post submission brief filedPetitionerE-FILED  Post-submission brief filed on behalf of State of Texas.
03/14/2011Appendix FiledRespondentAppendix to Brief on the merits (12) filed on behalf of Michael Bohannan.
03/14/2011Brief on the MeritsRespondentBrief on the merits (12) filed on behalf of Michael Bohannan.
01/31/2011Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner State of Texas' Brief on the Merits. (12)
10/05/2010Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to petition for review filed on behalf of Michael Wayne Bohannan (State Counsel for Offenders). (orig & 11)
08/11/2010Appendix FiledPetitionerattached to petition
08/11/2010Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition appendix attached (12) filed on behalf of the State of Texas.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/19/2014Case Stored - stored case location updated Row 11 G-4
05/03/2013Notice received U.S. Supreme Court Notice of petition for writ of certiorari denied.
02/20/2013Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.DeniedRespondent's Motion to Withdraw and/or to Stay Mandate Pending the U.S. Supreme Court's Disposition of Petition for Writ of Certiorari filed on behalf of Michael Bohannan denied.
01/31/2013Motion to stay mandate filed. Respondent's Motion to Withdraw and/or to Stay Mandate Pending the U.S. Supreme Court's Disposition of Petition for Writ of Certiorari filed on behalf of Michael Bohannan.
01/18/2013Case Stored G02 Row 21 C-4 (2 vols)
01/18/2013Mandate issued Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
01/18/2013Motion for Rehearing - DisposedDenied 
11/06/2012Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed Petitioner's Reply to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of State of Texas.
11/01/2012Designation of Lead Counsel  Lead Counsel Notice for the State of Texas:  Melinda Fletcher, P.O. Box 1744
Amarillo, Texas 79105, Telephone (806) 367-9407.
11/01/2012Response to Motion for Rehearing Response to Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of the State of Texas. (hc rec'd)
10/19/2012Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to motion for rehearing due no later than 11/5/12.
09/14/2012Case forwarded to Court  
09/14/2012Motion for Rehearing Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Michael Bohannan.
08/31/2012Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
08/31/2012Opinion issuedCourt of appeals' judgment affirmed 
12/14/2011Post submission brief filed E-FILED  Post-submission brief filed on behalf of State of Texas.
11/08/2011Oral argument  argued on behalf of petitioner by Catherine Palmore; argued on behalf of respondent by Kenneth Nash
11/07/2011Designation of Lead Counsel  E-FILED: Designation of Catherine Palmore as Petitioner Lead Counsel filed on behalf of the State of Texas.
10/10/2011Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral argument submission form submitted by petitioner attorney Catherine Palmore of Special Prosecution Unit of Huntsville, TX
09/28/2011Letter Filed SCANNED Notice of Abandonment of Counsel filed on behalf of Michael Bohannan.
08/12/2011Designation of Lead Counsel  Lead Counsel Designation submitted by Kenneth Nash filed on behalf of State Counsel for Offenders. (1)
08/05/2011Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral argument submission form submitted by Kenneth Nash of State Counsel for Offenders of Hunstville, TX
07/22/2011Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentSet for oral argument on 9:00 a.m. on 11/8/11; Time allotted to argue: 20/20 minutes
06/10/2011Petition for Review granted  
06/10/2011Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedThe date and time for oral argument are yet to be determined.
03/14/2011Appendix Filed Appendix to Brief on the merits (12) filed on behalf of Michael Bohannan.
03/14/2011Brief on the Merits Brief on the merits (12) filed on behalf of Michael Bohannan.
02/22/2011Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedRespondent's Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief on the Merits granted.  Response brief due no later than 3:00 p.m. on 3/14/11; Reply brief due 3/29/11; mailbox rule does not apply.  Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored.
02/18/2011Phone call from Clerk's Office Ms. Fletcher informed the Court that the motion is unopposed.
02/18/2011Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed motion for extension of time to file petition (2) filed on behalf of Michael Bohannan.
01/31/2011Brief on the Merits Petitioner State of Texas' Brief on the Merits. (12)
01/04/2011Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedState's motion for extension of time to file full briefing on the merits granted.  Petitioner's brief on the merits due no later than 3:00 p.m. on 2/2/11; Response brief due 2/22/11; Reply brief due 3/9/11; mailbox rule does not apply. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored.
01/03/2011Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed State's motion for extension of time to file full brief on the merits (orig & 1) filed by Special Prosecution Unit
12/27/2010Case Record Filed  INVENTORY IN MAIN REMARKS SECTION
12/10/2010Record Requested in Petition for Review  
12/03/2010Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief on the merits due no later than 3:00 p.m. on 1/3/11; Respondents brief due 1/24/11; Reply brief due 2/8/11; mailbox rule does not apply
10/05/2010Affidavit of Inability to Pay Court Costs Respondent, Michael Bohannan's affidavit of inability to pay cost. (orig)
10/05/2010Response to Petition Response to petition for review filed on behalf of Michael Wayne Bohannan (State Counsel for Offenders). (orig & 11)
09/24/2010Letter Received Letter from respondent Michael Bohannan stating he has "not be served with the notice of appeal nor provided any pleading associated therewith."  
09/07/2010Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than 3:00 p.m. on 10/7/10; mailbox rule does not apply
08/31/2010Case forwarded to Court  
08/27/2010Response Waiver filed Response waiver to petition for review.  On behalf of Michael Bohannan. (orig & 11)
08/11/2010Appendix Filed attached to petition
08/11/2010Petition for Review Petition appendix attached (12) filed on behalf of the State of Texas.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
01/18/2013Case StoredCase stored.G02 Row 21 C-4 (2 vols)
05/19/2014Case StoredCase stored.Row 11 G-4
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of Texas PetitionerMs. Erin K. Faseler
Ms. Melinda M. Fletcher
Mr. Sean Matthew Fifield
Ms. Catherine Anne Palmore
Bohannan, MichaelRespondentMr. George W. Lang II
Ms. Mary Elliott McKetta
Mr. Kenneth D. Nash
Ms. Andrea La Shawn Medley
Ms. Rebecca Rae Malek
Court of Appeals Information:
Reverse & Remand 
379 SW3d 293, 07-22-10 
9th Court of Appeals 
Honorable H. Hollis Horton 
Trial Court Information
435th District Court 
Montgomery 
Honorable Michael Thomas Seiler 
08-07-06907-CV 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site