Ninth Court of Appeals

Case: 09-15-00161-CR    
09-15-00161-CR
04/28/2015
Aggravated Robbery
Armaud Sears 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/07/2015Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
09/04/2015Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/13/2017Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsMotion or Writ Granted
03/23/2017Case forwarded to higher court 
03/22/2017Petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals 
02/21/2017Motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Denied
02/09/2017Motion for rehearing filed 
01/31/2017Judgment Issued 
01/31/2017Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed in part; Reversed and Remanded in part
12/28/2016Original exhibits filed 
12/22/2016Letter issued by the court 
01/25/2016Submitted 
01/04/2016Set for submission on briefs 
10/07/2015Case ready to be set 
10/07/2015Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
10/05/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/05/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/04/2015Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
07/14/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/14/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
07/13/2015Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
06/01/2015Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
04/28/2015Trial court certification filed 
04/28/2015Notice of appeal w/form from trial clerk 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/22/2017Appeal to Higher CourtHigher court review
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasAngela Mann Kneeland
Wayln G. Thompson
Sears, ArmaudCriminal - AppellantLindsey Scott
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court 
Jefferson 
Honorable Larry Gist 
13-17651 
Leah Hayes 
25 years 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site