Ninth Court of Appeals

Case: 09-12-00484-CV
10/16/2012
Mandamus
In Re Texas Rice Land Partners, Ltd., James E. Holland, and David C. Holland 
 
Yes 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 1 
Jefferson 
Honorable Gerald Eddins 
118867 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
03/04/2013Letter brief filedReal party in interest
02/20/2013Letter brief filedRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDescriptionDispositionDocument
05/23/2013Case stored  
05/23/2013Judgment Issued  
05/23/2013Opinion issuedMandamusMotion or Writ Denied
03/07/2013Submitted  
03/04/2013Letter brief filedReal party in interest 
02/20/2013Letter brief filedRelator 
02/19/2013Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argumentReal party in interest 
02/15/2013Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argumentRelator 
02/13/2013Letter filedReal party in interest 
02/05/2013Set for submission on oral argument  
02/05/2013Letter filedTrial court judge 
12/06/2012Letter issued by the court  
11/02/2012Response filedRelator 
10/29/2012Response filedReal party in interest 
10/17/2012Response requested by the court  
10/16/2012Record filedMandamus 
10/16/2012Petition for writ of mandamus filedRelator 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/23/2013Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Rice Land Partners, Ltd.RelatorTerry Wood
William Christian
TransCanada Keystone Pipeline, L.P.Real party in interestJames A. Freeman
Thomas A. Zabel
Amy Marlyse Burgert
Holland, David C.RelatorWilliam Christian
Terry Wood
Holland, James E.RelatorWilliam Christian
Terry Wood

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site