Supreme Court

Case: 09-0399    
09-0399
05/13/2009
Second Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY, ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY AND VASTAR RESOURCES, INC. 
STANLEY G. MARSHALL, JR., ROBERT RAY MARSHALL, CATHERINE IRENE MARSHALL F/K/A CATHERINE I.M. HASHMI, AND MARGARET ANN MARSHALL F/K/A MARGARET A.M. JEFFUS, BY AND THROUGH DAVID JEFFUS, AS INDEPENDENT EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF MARGARET MARSHALL 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/18/2011Motion for RehearingRespondent's Motion for Rehearing of Cause filedE-FILED  Respondents Vaquillas Ranch Co., Ltd., et al.'s SECOND Motion for Rehearing. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
06/24/2011Reply to ResponseRespondentE-FILED  Vaquillas Reply in Support of Supplement to Motion for Rehearing. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
06/23/2011Response to Brief filedEvent related to subsequent petition filed in case.Petitioner #2 Wagner Oil Co., et al.'s Letter in response to Vaquillas' Supplement to Motion for Rehearing. (2)
06/23/2011Supplement to Motion for RehearingRespondentE-FILED  Respondent Vaquillas' Supplement to Motion for Rehearing. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
06/16/2011Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedRespondentE-FILED  Vaquillas Ranch Co., Ltd.'s Reply in Support of Motion for Rehearing. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
05/31/2011Motion for RehearingRespondent's Motion for Rehearing of Cause filedEFILED:  Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Vaquillas Ranch Co., Ltd., Vaquillas Unproven Minerals, Ltd., and Vaquillas Proven Minerals, Ltd.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED
05/26/2011Motion for RehearingRespondent's Motion for Rehearing of Cause filedMotion for Rehearing filed on behalf of the Marshalls. (2)
04/21/2011Post submission brief filedRespondentReply to Wagner's Post-Submission Brief filed on behalf of Vaquillas Ranch Co, Ltd., Vaquillas Unproven Minerals, Ltd. and Vaquillas Proven Minerals, Ltd. (12)
03/04/2011Post submission brief filedRespondentResponse to Post-Submission Brief of BP America Production Co., et al. (12) filed on behalf of the Wagner petitioners.  
02/17/2011Post submission brief filedEvent related to subsequent petition filed in case.Petitioners #2 Wagner Oil Company, et al.'s Response to Respondents Vaquillas Ranch Co., Ltd.'s Post-Submission Brief.
02/11/2011Post submission brief filedEvent related to first petition filed in case.Petitioners #1 BP America Production Company, et al.'s Post-Submission Brief. (12)
01/19/2011Appendix FiledRespondentAppendix to Post-Submission Brief (12) filed on behalf of Vaquillas Ranch Co., et al.
01/19/2011Post submission brief filedRespondentPost-Submission Brief (12) filed on behalf of Vaquillas Ranch Co., et al.
12/10/2010Letter brief RespondentPost-submission letter brief on behalf of respondents, Stanley G. Marshall, Jr., et al. addressing two points raised at oral argument on December 7, 2010. (orig & 11)
12/07/2010Exhibits in case/cause filedEvent related to subsequent petition filed in case.Bench exhibits filed on behalf of pet#2, Wagner Oil Co. (orig & 11)
12/07/2010Exhibits in case/cause filedEvent related to first petition filed in case.Bench exhibits filed on behalf of pet #1, BP America.  (orig & 11)
12/01/2010Supplement to Amicus CuriaeReceived (instead of filed)Supplemental brief of amicus curiae, Kelly Hart & Hallman, LLP, in support of pet#2, Wagner's petition for review. (orig & 11)
11/29/2010Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedEvent related to subsequent petition filed in case.Response to Tex. Land & Min. Owners Assoc'n Amicus (12) filed on behalf of Wagner Oil Co., et al.
08/02/2010Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief (12) filed on behalf of Texas Land and Mineral Owners Assoc'n.  Submitted by Mary Keeney, Graves Dougherty Hearon & Moody, 401 Congress Ave., Ste. 2200, Austin TX 78701, Tel. (512)480-5682.
07/20/2010Supplemental Brief filedAmicus Curiae Supplemental Brief of Amicus Curiae Texas Oil & Gas Association. (12) Submitted by Everard A. Marseglia, Jr.
06/16/2010Reply BriefEvent related to first petition filed in case.Petitioner 1 BP America Production Company's Reply Brief on the Merits. (12)
06/15/2010Reply BriefEvent related to subsequent petition filed in case.Reply Brief on the merits (12) filed on behalf of Wagner petitioners.
06/03/2010Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus brief on behalf of Texas Oil & Gas Association.  Submitted by Everard A. Marseglia, Jr.; LISKOW & LEWIS, 1001 Fannin, Ste. 1800, Houston, TX 77002, PH. [713] 651-2900, FX. [713] 651-2908. (12)
05/12/2010Brief on the MeritsRespondentBrief on the merits (12) filed on behalf of the Marshalls.
05/12/2010Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent, Vaquillas Ranch Co., Ltd., et al.'s brief on the merits. (12)
04/21/2010Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus brief on behalf of Texas Oil & Gas Association.  Submitted by Everard A. Marseglia, Jr.; LISKOW & LEWIS, 1001 Fannin, Ste. 1800, Houston, TX 77002, PH. [713] 651-2900, FX. [713] 651-2908. (12)
02/19/2010Brief on the MeritsEvent related to first petition filed in case.Pet 1, BP America Production Co., et al.'s brief on the merits. (12)
02/12/2010Brief on the MeritsEvent related to subsequent petition filed in case.PET #2's brief on merits (12) filed on behalf of Wagner Oil.
11/19/2009Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus curiae letter (12) received on behalf of Texas Oil & Gas Assoc'n., submitted by Mr. Everard . Marseglia, Jr., 1001 Fannin, Suite 1800, Houston, TX.  77002 , Phone (713) 651-2900, Fax (713) 651-2908.
11/12/2009Reply to ResponseEvent related to first petition filed in case.Reply to response to pet/rev.  On behalf of PET 1, BP America Production Co., et al. (12)
10/12/2009Reply to ResponseEvent related to subsequent petition filed in case.PET #2's reply brief (12) filed on behalf of the Wagner petitioners.
09/30/2009Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus curiae brief on behalf of Kelly Hart & Hallman LLP in support of the Wagner petition for review, submitted by Mr. Dee J. Kelly, Kely, Hart & Hallman LLP, 201 Main St., Suite 2500, Fort Worth, TX.  76102  Phone (817) 332-2500, Fax (817) 878-9280. (orig & 11)
09/28/2009Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to petition for review.  Filed on behalf of Vaquillas Ranch Co., LTD., Vaquillas Unproven Minerals, Ltd., and Vaquillas Proven Minerals, Ltd. (orig & 11)
09/28/2009Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to BP America Production Co.'s pet/rev.  On behalf of Stanley G. Marshall, Jr. (12)
09/16/2009Amicus Curiae Letter ReceivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus letter on behalf of Texas Oil & Gas Association.  Submitted by Everard A. Marseglia, Jr.; LISKOW & LEWIS, 1001 Fannin, Ste. 1800, Houston, TX 77002, PH. [713] 651-2900, FX. [713] 651-2908. (12)
08/12/2009Appendix FiledEvent related to subsequent petition filed in case.attached to petition
08/12/2009Petition for Review #2PetitionerPET #2's PFR appendix attached (12) filed on behalf of Wagner Oil Co., et al.
07/15/2009Appendix FiledEvent related to first petition filed in case.Appendix attached to PFR 1.
07/15/2009Petition for ReviewPetitionerOn behalf of BP America Production Company, et al. (12)
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/02/2011Case Stored G02 Row 19 I-3 (2 vols); I-4 (8 vols); and I-5 (2 vols)
08/29/2011Mandate issued Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
08/19/2011Motion for Rehearing - DisposedDenied with Justice not sitting. 
07/18/2011Case forwarded to Court  
07/18/2011Motion for Rehearing E-FILED  Respondents Vaquillas Ranch Co., Ltd., et al.'s SECOND Motion for Rehearing. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
07/01/2011Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.DeniedMotion to argue denied.
07/01/2011Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.DeniedMotion for Severance denied.
07/01/2011Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.DeniedMotion to Modify, Correct or Reform the Judgment denied.
07/01/2011Corrected opinionIssued 
07/01/2011Motion for Rehearing - DisposedDenied with Justice not sitting. 
07/01/2011Motion for Rehearing - DisposedDenied with Justice not sitting. 
06/24/2011Reply to Response E-FILED  Vaquillas Reply in Support of Supplement to Motion for Rehearing. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
06/23/2011Response to Brief filed Petitioner #2 Wagner Oil Co., et al.'s Letter in response to Vaquillas' Supplement to Motion for Rehearing. (2)
06/23/2011Supplement to Motion for Rehearing E-FILED  Respondent Vaquillas' Supplement to Motion for Rehearing. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
06/17/2011Response to Motion filed Respondent's, the Marshall's, letter in response to the Vaquillas motion for rehearing, severance & re-argument.  (orig & 11)
06/16/2011Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed E-FILED  Vaquillas Ranch Co., Ltd.'s Reply in Support of Motion for Rehearing. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
06/15/2011Response to Motion filed Response to Vaquillas Motion for Rehearing, Severance, and Re-Argument filed on behalf of Wagner Oil Company, et al. (2)
06/13/2011Response to Motion filed E-FILED  Response to Motion for Rehearings and Motion to Modify filed on behalf of BP Production Co., et al.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED.
06/13/2011Response to Motion filed E-FILED  Vaquilla's Response to Wagner's motion to modify, correct, or reform. (HARD COPIES REC'D)
06/13/2011Letter Filed Letter informs the Court that the Wagner petitioners will take no position on the Motion for Rehearing. (orig & 1)
06/02/2011Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Response to Vaquillas Motion for Rehearing, Severance, and Re-Argument due no later than 3:00 p.m. on 6/17/11; mailbox rule does not apply.
05/31/2011Case forwarded to Court  
05/31/2011Motion to Argue filed E-FILED  Motion to Re-argue INCORPORATED WITH MOTION FOR REHEARING filed on behalf of Vaquillas.
05/31/2011Motion for Severance filed E-FILED  Motion for Severance INCORPORATED WITH MOTION FOR REHEARING filed on behalf of Vaquillas.
05/31/2011Motion for Rehearing EFILED:  Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Vaquillas Ranch Co., Ltd., Vaquillas Unproven Minerals, Ltd., and Vaquillas Proven Minerals, Ltd.  HARD COPIES RECEIVED
05/27/2011Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested responses to both motion for rehearing and motion to modify judgment due no later than 3:00 p.m. on 6/13/11; mailbox rule does not apply
05/26/2011Case forwarded to Court  
05/26/2011Miscellaneous Motion Motion of the Wagner Petitioners to Modify, Correct or Reform the Judgment (3).
05/26/2011Motion for Rehearing Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of the Marshalls. (2)
05/13/2011Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
05/13/2011Opinion issuedIssued 
05/13/2011Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed & judgment rendered 
04/21/2011Post submission brief filed Reply to Wagner's Post-Submission Brief filed on behalf of Vaquillas Ranch Co, Ltd., Vaquillas Unproven Minerals, Ltd. and Vaquillas Proven Minerals, Ltd. (12)
03/04/2011Post submission brief filed Response to Post-Submission Brief of BP America Production Co., et al. (12) filed on behalf of the Wagner petitioners.  
02/17/2011Post submission brief filed Petitioners #2 Wagner Oil Company, et al.'s Response to Respondents Vaquillas Ranch Co., Ltd.'s Post-Submission Brief.
02/11/2011Post submission brief filed Petitioners #1 BP America Production Company, et al.'s Post-Submission Brief. (12)
01/19/2011Appendix Filed Appendix to Post-Submission Brief (12) filed on behalf of Vaquillas Ranch Co., et al.
01/19/2011Post submission brief filed Post-Submission Brief (12) filed on behalf of Vaquillas Ranch Co., et al.
12/10/2010Phone call from Clerk's Office To respondent's atty office, Mr. Timothy Patton requesting electronic copy of post-submission letter brief filed on 12/10/10.  Spoke to Debbie and she said that she would relay the message to Mr. Patton.
12/10/2010Letter brief  Post-submission letter brief on behalf of respondents, Stanley G. Marshall, Jr., et al. addressing two points raised at oral argument on December 7, 2010. (orig & 11)
12/07/2010Oral argument  argued on behalf of petitioner, BP America Production Co., by Thomas R. Phillips; argued on behalf of petitioner, Wagner Oil Co, et al., by Pamela Stanton Baron; argued on behalf of respondents, Stanley G. Marshall, Jr., et al., by Tim Patton; argued on behalf of respondents, Vaquillas Ranch Co, Ltd., et al., by David M. Gunn  (Justice Guzman not sitting)
12/07/2010Oral argument  argued on behalf of petitioner, BP America Production Co., by Thomas R. Phillips; argued on behalf of petitioner, Wagner Oil Co, et al., by Pamela Stanton Baron; argued on behalf of respondents, Stanley G. Marshall, Jr., et al., by Tim Patton; argued on behalf of respondents, Vaquillas Ranch Co, Ltd., et al., by David M. Gunn  (Justice Guzman not sitting)
12/07/2010Exhibits in case/cause filed Bench exhibits filed on behalf of pet#2, Wagner Oil Co. (orig & 11)
12/07/2010Exhibits in case/cause filed Bench exhibits filed on behalf of pet #1, BP America.  (orig & 11)
12/03/2010Motion to Argue disposedFiling grantedUnopposed motion of the Wagner petitioners to allow two counsel to present rebuttal argument granted
12/01/2010Supplement to Amicus Curiae Supplemental brief of amicus curiae, Kelly Hart & Hallman, LLP, in support of pet#2, Wagner's petition for review. (orig & 11)
11/29/2010Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed Response to Tex. Land & Min. Owners Assoc'n Amicus (12) filed on behalf of Wagner Oil Co., et al.
11/22/2010Miscellaneous Motion Unopposed motion of the Wagner petitioners to allow two counsel to present rebuttal argument (2) filed on behalf of Wagner Oil Co.
10/12/2010Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral argument submission form submitted by Thomas R. Phillips of Baker Botts L.L.P. of Austin, TX
10/11/2010Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral argument submission form submitted by respondent attorney David M. Gunn of Beck, Redden & Secrest, L.L.P. of Houston, TX
10/11/2010Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral argument form submitted by petitioner#2 by Pamela Stanton Baron, Attorney at Law, of Austin, TX
10/08/2010Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral argument submission form submitted by Tim Patton of Timothy Patton, P.C. of San Antonio, TX
10/01/2010Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentSet for oral argument on 12/7/10 @ 9 a.m.; time allotted to argue: 20/20 minutes (Justice Guzman not sitting)
10/01/2010Petition for Review granted  
10/01/2010Petition for Review disposedFiling granted 
10/01/2010Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentSet for oral argument on 12/7/10 @ 9 a.m.; time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes (Justice Guzman not sitting)
10/01/2010Petition for Review granted  
10/01/2010Petition for Review disposedFiling granted 
08/11/2010Notice from attorney regarding vacation dates Respondent's (Stanley G. Marshall, Jr., et al.), lead counsel, Mr. Tim Patton submits his vacation notice.  He will be on vacation Nov. 2-18, 2010 and Jan. 18-28, 2011 and requests that the Court not set any oral arguments during those periods of time. (orig & 1)
08/02/2010Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief (12) filed on behalf of Texas Land and Mineral Owners Assoc'n.  Submitted by Mary Keeney, Graves Dougherty Hearon & Moody, 401 Congress Ave., Ste. 2200, Austin TX 78701, Tel. (512)480-5682.
07/20/2010Supplemental Brief filed Supplemental Brief of Amicus Curiae Texas Oil & Gas Association. (12) Submitted by Everard A. Marseglia, Jr.
06/16/2010Reply Brief Petitioner 1 BP America Production Company's Reply Brief on the Merits. (12)
06/15/2010Reply Brief Reply Brief on the merits (12) filed on behalf of Wagner petitioners.
06/03/2010Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus brief on behalf of Texas Oil & Gas Association.  Submitted by Everard A. Marseglia, Jr.; LISKOW & LEWIS, 1001 Fannin, Ste. 1800, Houston, TX 77002, PH. [713] 651-2900, FX. [713] 651-2908. (12)
05/26/2010Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedBP's reply brief is due no later than 3pm, June 16, 2010.  further requests will be disfavored.
05/25/2010Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed motion for extension of time to file reply brief (3) filed on behalf of BP America Production Co., et al.
05/21/2010Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedWagner's reply brief is due no later than 3pm, June 16, 2010.  further requests will be disfavored.
05/19/2010Phone call from Clerk's Office Mr. Patton informed the Court that he will be sending the appendix to the brief on the merits on a CD, because he could not attach it via e-mail.
05/18/2010Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed motion for extension of time to file reply brief on the merits (2) filed on behalf of Wagner Oil Co., et al.
05/17/2010Phone call from Clerk's Office Requested electronic brief of Stanley's brief on the merits.
05/12/2010Document filed (see remarks) CD labeled "Oral Arguments (11/28/2007) No. 04-06-478-CV BP America Production Co., et al. v. Vaquillas Ranch Co., Ltd., et al.: in the Fourth Court of Appeals."  CD is attached in the back cover of each copy of the Vaquillas Ranch Co., Ltd., et al.'s brief on the merits.
05/12/2010Brief on the Merits Brief on the merits (12) filed on behalf of the Marshalls.
05/12/2010Brief on the Merits Respondent, Vaquillas Ranch Co., Ltd., et al.'s brief on the merits. (12)
04/21/2010Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus brief on behalf of Texas Oil & Gas Association.  Submitted by Everard A. Marseglia, Jr.; LISKOW & LEWIS, 1001 Fannin, Ste. 1800, Houston, TX 77002, PH. [713] 651-2900, FX. [713] 651-2908. (12)
04/13/2010Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMarshall, Jr., et al's response brief is due no later than 3pm, May 12, 2010.  Reply brief is due no later than 3pm, May 27, 2010.  no further requests will be considered.  mailbox rule does not apply.
04/12/2010Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed second motion for extension of time to file brief (3) filed on behalf of Stanley G. Marshall, Jr.
04/09/2010Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedVaquillas Ranch's response brief is due no later than 3pm, May 12, 2010.  Reply brief is due no later than 3pm, May 27, 2010.  no further requests will be considered.  mailbox rule does not apply.
04/08/2010Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed second motion for extension of time to file brief (3) filed on behalf of Vaquillas Ranch Co., Ltd., et al.
03/11/2010Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMarshall's m/e/t to file resp bom is granted.  Resp br is due n/l/t 3pm, April 12, 2010.  Reply br is due n/l/t 3pm, April 27, 2010.  further reqs will be disfavored.  mailbox rule dna.
03/10/2010Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed m/e/t to file resp's brief on the merits. On behalf of Stanley G. Marshall, Jr., et al. (3)
03/05/2010Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedVaquillas' m/e/t to file resp bom is granted.  Resp br is due n/l/t 3pm, April 12, 2010.  Reply br is due n/l/t 3pm, April 27, 2010.  further reqs will be disfavored.  mailbox rule dna.
03/04/2010Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed first motion for extension of time to file brief on the merits (3) filed on behalf of Vaquillas Parties.
02/19/2010Brief on the Merits Pet 1, BP America Production Co., et al.'s brief on the merits. (12)
02/12/2010Brief on the Merits PET #2's brief on merits (12) filed on behalf of Wagner Oil.
01/12/2010Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedWagner's 2nd m/e/t to file pet's bom is granted.  Pet's br is due n/l/t 3pm, February 19, 2010.  Resp's br is due n/l/t 3pm, March 11, 2010.  Reply br is due n/l/t 3pm, March 26, 2010.  no further reqs will be considered.  Mailbox rule dna.
01/11/2010Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Second unopposed m/e/t to file Pets' brief on the merits.  On behalf of (Pet 2) Wagner Oil Co., et al. (3)
01/06/2010Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedBP America's 2nd m/e/t to file pet's bom is granted.  Pet's br is due n/l/t 3pm, February 19, 2010.  Resp's br is due n/l/t 3pm, March 11, 2010.  Reply br is due n/l/t 3pm, March 26, 2010.  no further reqs will be considered.  Mailbox rule dna.
01/05/2010Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed m/e/t to file Pet's (#1) brief on the merits. On behalf of BP America Production Company, et al.  (3)
12/15/2009Case Record Filed  INVENTORY IN MAIN REMARKS SECTION
12/10/2009Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedWagner's m/e/t to file pet's bom is granted.  Pet's br is due n/l/t 3pm, January 20, 2010.  Resp's br is due n/l/t 3pm, February 9, 2010.  Reply br is due n/l/t 3pm, February 24, 2010.  further reqs will be disfavored.  Mailbox rule dna.
12/07/2009Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion of Wagner Petitioners for extension of time to file Petitioners' Brief on the Merits. (3)
12/04/2009Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedBP America's m/e/t to file pet's bom is granted.  Pet's br is due n/l/t 3pm, January 20, 2010.  Resp's br is due n/l/t 3pm, February 9, 2010.  Reply br is due n/l/t 3pm, February 24, 2010.  further reqs will be disfavored.  Mailbox rule dna.
12/02/2009Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed PET's unopposed motion for extension of time to file brief on the merits (3) filed on behalf of BP America Production Co., et al.
11/24/2009Record Requested in Petition for Review  
11/20/2009Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Pet br due n/l/t 3:00 p.m. on 12/21/09; Rsp br due 1/11/2010; Reply br due 1/26/2010; mlbx rule d/n/a
11/19/2009Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus curiae letter (12) received on behalf of Texas Oil & Gas Assoc'n., submitted by Mr. Everard . Marseglia, Jr., 1001 Fannin, Suite 1800, Houston, TX.  77002 , Phone (713) 651-2900, Fax (713) 651-2908.
11/12/2009Reply to Response Reply to response to pet/rev.  On behalf of PET 1, BP America Production Co., et al. (12)
10/12/2009Reply to Response PET #2's reply brief (12) filed on behalf of the Wagner petitioners.
10/08/2009MET to file reply disposed ofFiling grantedm/e/t to file reply is granted.  The reply is due in this office on November 12, 2009.  FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
10/05/2009Motion to Extend Time to File Reply filed Unopposed m/e/t to file pet's reply to the response to its pet/rev. On behalf of Pet 1, BP America Production Company, et al. (3)
09/30/2009Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus curiae brief on behalf of Kelly Hart & Hallman LLP in support of the Wagner petition for review, submitted by Mr. Dee J. Kelly, Kely, Hart & Hallman LLP, 201 Main St., Suite 2500, Fort Worth, TX.  76102  Phone (817) 332-2500, Fax (817) 878-9280. (orig & 11)
09/29/2009Case forwarded to Court  
09/29/2009Case forwarded to Court  
09/28/2009Response to Petition Response to petition for review.  Filed on behalf of Vaquillas Ranch Co., LTD., Vaquillas Unproven Minerals, Ltd., and Vaquillas Proven Minerals, Ltd. (orig & 11)
09/28/2009Response to Petition Response to BP America Production Co.'s pet/rev.  On behalf of Stanley G. Marshall, Jr. (12)
09/16/2009Amicus Curiae Letter Received Amicus letter on behalf of Texas Oil & Gas Association.  Submitted by Everard A. Marseglia, Jr.; LISKOW & LEWIS, 1001 Fannin, Ste. 1800, Houston, TX 77002, PH. [713] 651-2900, FX. [713] 651-2908. (12)
09/15/2009Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedVaquillas' m/e/t to file response to petition for review is granted.   Response is due September 28, 2009.  further reqs will be disfavored.  
09/15/2009Motion for Extension of Time to File Response RSP's unopposed motion for extension of time to file response (3) filed on behalf of Vaquillas Ranch Co., Ltd.
09/15/2009Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMarshall's 2nd m/e/t to file response to BP's pet/rev is granted.   Response is due September 28, 2009.  NO FURTHER REQUESTS WILL BE CONSIDERED.
09/14/2009Motion for Extension of Time to File Response RSP's unopposed motion for extension of time to file response (3) filed on behalf of Stanley G. Marshall, et al.
08/13/2009Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedStanley G. Marshall, Jr., et al's m/e/t to file response to BP America's pet/rev is granted.   Response is due September 14, 2009.  Further Requests will be disfavored.
08/12/2009Appendix Filed attached to petition
08/12/2009Petition for Review #2 PET #2's PFR appendix attached (12) filed on behalf of Wagner Oil Co., et al.
08/11/2009Motion for Extension of Time to File Response RSP's unopposed motion for extension of time to file response to petition (3) filed on behalf of Stanley G. Marshall.
07/15/2009Appendix Filed Appendix attached to PFR 1.
07/15/2009Petition for Review On behalf of BP America Production Company, et al. (12)
06/23/2009Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedWagner Oil Company, et al.'s second m/e/t to file pet/rev is granted.   Pet/rev is due August 14, 2009.  FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
06/22/2009Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed PET #2's unopposed second motion for extension of time to file petition (3) filed on behalf of Wagner Oil Co.
05/20/2009Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedWagner Oil Company, et al.'s m/e/t to file pet/rev is granted.   Pet/rev is due July 15, 2009.
05/19/2009Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review #2 filed PET #2's unopposed motion for extension of time to file petition (3) filed on behalf of Wagner Oil Co., et al.
05/14/2009Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedPet's m/e/t to file petition for review granted.  Petition for review due 7/15/09.
05/13/2009Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed m/e/t to file pet/rev. On behalf of BP America Production Company, et al. (12)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
11/02/2011Case StoredCase stored.G02 Row 19 I-3 (2 vols); I-4 (8 vols); and I-5 (2 vols)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Land and Mineral Owners Assoc'nAmicus CuriaeMs. Mary A. Keeney
BP America Production CompanyPetitioner 1Mr. Evan A. Young
Ms. Stacy Rogers Sharp
Mr. J. Gregory Copeland
Mr. Thomas R. Phillips
Ms. Jennifer Hope Naylor Kingaard
Mr. James P. Pennington
Mr. Charles G. King
Kelly Hart & Hallman LLPAmicus CuriaeMr. Dee J. Kelly
Wagner Oil CompanyPetitioner 2Mr. Arnulfo Gonzalez
Mr. John Michael Quinlan
Ms. Pamela Stanton Baron
Mr. Michael E. McElroy
Marshall, Jr., Stanley G.RespondentMr. Timothy Patton
Mr. James K. Jones Jr.
Mr. Edward Frederick Maddox
Vaquillas Ranch Co., Ltd.RespondentMr. Richard G. Morales Jr.
Mr. David M. Gunn
Mr. Ricardo E. Morales
Ms. Marisela Rangel
Ms. Erin H. Huber
The Texas Oil & Gas AssociationAmicus CuriaeMr. Everard A. Marseglia Jr.
Court of Appeals Information:
Aff.(part)Rev.&Rem(part) 
288 SW3d 430, 12-10-08 
4th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Steven C. Hilbig 
Trial Court Information
49th District Court 
Zapata 
Honorable Manuel R. Flores 
4,091 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site