Supreme Court

Case: 09-0306    
09-0306
04/16/2009
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
BETTY YVON LESLEY, ET AL. 
VETERANS LAND BOARD OF THE STATE OF TEXAS, ET AL. 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/12/2011Motion for RehearingRespondent's Motion for Rehearing of Cause filedE-FILED  Motion for Rehearing filed on bhealf of Bluegreen Southwest One, LP.
10/12/2010Post submission brief filedRespondentResponse to Post-Submission Brief (12) filed on behalf of Bluegreen Southwest One, LP.
09/27/2010Post submission brief filedPetitionerPetitioners Betty Yvon Lesley, et al.'s Post-Submission Brief. (11)
03/30/2010Reply BriefPetitionerBrief in reply to respondent BlueGreen Southwest One, L.P., brief on the merits (12) filed on behalf of Betty Yvon Lesley, et al.
03/15/2010Brief on the MeritsRespondentResp, Bluegreen Southwest One, L.P.'s brief on the merits. (12)
03/02/2010Reply BriefPetitionerPet's reply brief to Veterans Land Board's response brief on the merits.  On behalf of Betty Yvon Lesley, et al. (12)
03/02/2010Reply BriefPetitionerPet's reply brief to Individual Lot Owner's response brief on the merits.  On behalf of Betty Yvon Lesley, et al. (12)
02/12/2010Brief on the MeritsRespondentRSP's brief on the merits (12) filed on behalf of Veterans Land Board.
01/12/2010Brief on the MeritsRespondentRSP's brief on the merits (12) filed on behalf of Lot Owner Respondents.
12/22/2009Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's brief on the merits.  On behalf of Betty Yvon Lesley, et al. (orig & 11)
09/24/2009Reply to ResponsePetitionerPET's reply to response (12) filed on behalf of Betty Yvon Lesley.
09/14/2009Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to pet/review.  On behalf of Bluegreen Southwest One, L.P. (orig & 11)
09/10/2009Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply to McDermott's & Landowner's response to pet/rev.  On behalf of Betty Yvon Lesley, et al. (12)
08/13/2009Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to pet/review.  On behalf of the Individual Lot Owners (Beth and Kevin McDermott and Landowner) (orig & 11)
06/25/2009Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus Brief (12) received on behalf of Texas General Land Office. Submitted by Larry Borella, Acting Director of Oil and Gas Section, Texas General Land Office, P.O. Box 12873, Austin, TX 78701, Phone (512)305-9121
06/11/2009Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)On behalf of Maston C. Courtney.  Submitted by Maston C. Courtney of Courtney, Countiss, Brian & Bailey, LLP., PO Box 9238, Amarillo, TX 79106.  Phone 806-372-5569.  Fax 806-372-9761.
05/26/2009Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Amicus curiae brief in support of Betty Yvon Lesley's petition/review submitted on behalf of Bruce M. Kramer, McGinnis, Lochridge & Kilgore, L.L.P., 1221 McKinney St., Suite 3200, Houston, TX  77010 (Phone) (713) 615-8500, (Fax) (713) 328-1803. (orig & 11)
05/18/2009Appendix FiledPetitionerattached to petition
05/18/2009Petition for ReviewPetitionerPFR appendix attached (12) filed on behalf of Betty Yvon Lesley, et al.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/05/2012Description of document returned to Supreme Court Postcard to amicus atty, Mr. Bruce M. Kramer.  Updated address and resent postcard.
12/21/2011Case Stored G02 Exhibit Room H-2 (3 vols + 2 boxes)
12/16/2011Mandate issued Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
12/16/2011Motion for Rehearing - DisposedDenied with Justice not sitting. 
11/23/2011Description of document returned to Supreme Court Postcard to Mr. Byron L. Woolley, atty for Landowners, to correct address.
10/18/2011Address Change  Matthew D. Bradley's change of address:  Matthew Bradley PC, 750 E. Mulberry, Suite 510, San Antonio, TX 78212, Tel. (210-738-8750. (1)
10/17/2011Description of document returned to Supreme Court Postcards to Mr. Donald Prichard Bevis.  Called Mr. Bevis and obtained correct address information.
10/13/2011Address Change  Address change letter from Mr. Byron L. Woolley, atty for Landowner.  New Address is:  Woolley Wilson, LLP, 6440 N. Central Expwy., Suite 505, Dallas, TX.  75206, (214) 871-5080. (1)
10/12/2011Case forwarded to Court  
10/12/2011Motion for Rehearing E-FILED  Motion for Rehearing filed on bhealf of Bluegreen Southwest One, LP.
09/26/2011Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedMotion for Rehearing is due October 12, 2011. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME WILL BE DISFAVORED.
09/26/2011Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing E-FILED: Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Veterans Land Board of the State of Texas (VLB), et al.
08/26/2011Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
08/26/2011Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed; cause remanded to trial court 
10/12/2010Post submission brief filed Response to Post-Submission Brief (12) filed on behalf of Bluegreen Southwest One, LP.
09/27/2010Post submission brief filed Petitioners Betty Yvon Lesley, et al.'s Post-Submission Brief. (11)
09/15/2010Oral argument  argued on behalf of petitioner by Chris Aycock and Charles Tighe; argued on behalf of respondent, Bluegreen Southwest One, L.P. by Laura H. Burney; argued on behalf of respondent by Stephen E. Haynes (time allotted: 20 minutes)  (Chief Justice Jefferson not sitting)
08/25/2010Phone call from Clerk's Office call made to parties regarding denial of joint motion for leave of Court to allow three attorneys to present oral argument; left voicemails.
08/25/2010Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.DeniedUnopposed JOINT motion of Petitioners and Respondents for leave of Court to allow three attorneys to present Oral Argument denied
08/16/2010Miscellaneous Motion Unopposed JOINT motion of Petitioners and Respondents for leave of Court to allow (3) three attorneys to present Oral Argument. On behalf of Betty Yvon Lesley, et al. AND Veterans Land Board of the State of Texas, et al. (3)
08/12/2010Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received OA submission form submitted by petitioner attorneys Chris Aycock and Charles Tighe of Cotton, Bledsoe, Tighe & Dawson, PC of Midland, TX
08/11/2010Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance as counsel of record for Bluegreen Southwest One, L.P. for purpose of oral argument by Laura H. Burney
08/11/2010Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received OA submission form for Lot Owner submitted by Stephen E. Haynes of Haynes Law Firm, P.C. of Brownwood, TX
08/11/2010Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received OA submission form on behalf of Bluegreen Southeast One, L.P. from Laura H. Burney of Law Office of Laura H. Burney of San Antonio
08/10/2010Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received OA submission form submitted by Veterans Land Board of the State of Texas attorney Priscilla M. Hubenak of Office of the Attorney General of Austin
07/19/2010Address Change  For respondent, Bluegreen Southwest One, L.P., atty., Mr. Thomas H. Crofts, Jr., Crofts & Callaway, P.C., 300 Austin Highway, Suite 120, San Antonio, TX.  78209-5303.  Telephone & fax numbers remain the same. (orig)
07/16/2010Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentSet for oral argument on 9/15/10 @ 9 a.m.; time allotted to argue
07/02/2010Petition for Review granted  
07/02/2010Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedDate and Time are yet to be determined
03/30/2010Reply Brief Brief in reply to respondent BlueGreen Southwest One, L.P., brief on the merits (12) filed on behalf of Betty Yvon Lesley, et al.
03/15/2010Brief on the Merits Resp, Bluegreen Southwest One, L.P.'s brief on the merits. (12)
03/02/2010Reply Brief Pet's reply brief to Veterans Land Board's response brief on the merits.  On behalf of Betty Yvon Lesley, et al. (12)
03/02/2010Reply Brief Pet's reply brief to Individual Lot Owner's response brief on the merits.  On behalf of Betty Yvon Lesley, et al. (12)
02/23/2010Description of document returned to Supreme Court Letter returned from Mr. Lawrence Fleishman, atty. for resp, Landowner.  Left message on VM for a return phone call.
02/17/2010Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedBluegreen's 2nd m/e/t to file resp bom is granted.   Resp br is due n/l/t 3pm, March 15, 2010.  Reply is due n/l/t 3pm, March 30, 2010.  no further reqs will be considered.  mailbox rule dna.
02/12/2010Brief on the Merits RSP's brief on the merits (12) filed on behalf of Veterans Land Board.
02/08/2010Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed RSP's unopposed second motion for extension of time to file brief on the merits (3) filed on behalf of Bluegreen Southwest One, L.P.
01/29/2010Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedM/e/t to file pet's reply bom is granted.   Pet's reply br is due n/l/t 3pm, March 1, 2010.  further reqs will be disfavored. mailbox rule dna.
01/26/2010Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed m/e/t to file pet's reply brief on the merits to Individual Lot Owner Resps' brief.  On behalf of Betty Yvon Lesley, et al. (3)
01/15/2010Document filed (see remarks) RSP's "supplemental merits brief in opposition to petition for review" identifies parties and counsel (12) filed on behalf of Lot Owner respondents.
01/14/2010Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedBluegreen SW One's  m/e/t to file resp's bom is granted.  Resp's br is due n/l/t 3pm, February 12, 2010.  Reply br is due n/l/t 3pm, March 1, 2010.  further reqs will be disfavored.  mailbox rule dna.
01/12/2010Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed m/e/t to file resp's brief on the merits. On behalf of Bluegreen Southwest One, L.P. (3)
01/12/2010Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedVLB's m/e/t to file resp's bom is granted.  Resp's br is due n/l/t 3pm, February 12, 2010.  Reply br is due n/l/t 3pm, March 1, 2010.  further reqs will be disfavored.  mailbox rule dna.
01/12/2010Brief on the Merits RSP's brief on the merits (12) filed on behalf of Lot Owner Respondents.
01/08/2010Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed RSP's unopposed motion for extension of time to file brief (3) filed on behalf of VLB.
12/22/2009Brief on the Merits Petitioner's brief on the merits.  On behalf of Betty Yvon Lesley, et al. (orig & 11)
11/25/2009Motion for extension of length of brief disposedDeniedPetitioners' Motion to Exceed Page Limits denied
11/20/2009Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedPets' m/e/t to file brief on the merits granted.  Pet br due n/l/t 3:00 p.m. on 12/23/09; Rsp br due 1/12/2010; Reply br due 1/27/2010; mlbx rule d/n/a.  Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored.
11/20/2009Phone call from Clerk's Office To Mr. David Lauritzen to inform him that the m/e/t is granted until 12/23/09, but the m/e/l page limit is still pending.
11/09/2009Case Record Filed  INVENTORY IN MAIN REMARKS SECTION
11/09/2009Phone call from Clerk's Office S/W Mr. David Lauritzen requesting an additional $10 for motion to exceed page limits.  He said he will get the check out today.
11/09/2009Motion for Extension of Length of Brief filed Petitioners' Motion to Exceed Page Limits (incorporated w/ Motion to Extend Time to File Brief on the Merits).  On behalf of Betty Yvon Lesley, et al.
11/09/2009Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Petitioners' Motion to Extend Time to File Brief on the Merits (incorporated w/ Motion to Exceed Page Limits).  On behalf of Betty Yvon Lesley, et al.
10/27/2009Record Requested in Petition for Review  
10/23/2009Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits have been requested:  Pet's br is due n/l/t 3pm, November 23, 3009.  Resp br is due n/l/t 3pm, December 14, 2009.  Reply br is due n/l/t 3pm, December 29, 2009
10/05/2009Designation of Lead Counsel  to inform the Court that Lead Atty. Michael J. Murray left the firm Crofts & Callaway.  This firm represents Resp, Bluegreen Southwest One, LP. Atty. Sharon E. Callaway is the new lead counsel. (1) Updated in CMS.
09/24/2009Reply to Response PET's reply to response (12) filed on behalf of Betty Yvon Lesley.
09/14/2009Response to Petition Response to pet/review.  On behalf of Bluegreen Southwest One, L.P. (orig & 11)
09/10/2009Reply to Response Reply to McDermott's & Landowner's response to pet/rev.  On behalf of Betty Yvon Lesley, et al. (12)
08/27/2009MET to file reply disposed ofFiling grantedM/e/t to file reply to response is granted.   The reply is due September 10, 2009.  FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED.
08/26/2009Motion to Extend Time to File Reply filed Unopposed m/e/t to file REPLY to McDermott and Landowner's response to pet/rev. On behalf of Betty Yvon Lesley, et al. (3)
08/13/2009Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedBluegreen Southwest One, L.P.'s m/e/t to file response to pet/rev is granted.   Resp is due n/l/t 3pm, September 14, 2009. Mailbox Rule dna.  FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED
08/13/2009Letter Filed Letter from respondent, Veterans Land Board of the State of Texas, to inform the Court that the VLB is not filing a substantive response to the pet/review. (orig & 11)
08/13/2009Response to Petition Response to pet/review.  On behalf of the Individual Lot Owners (Beth and Kevin McDermott and Landowner) (orig & 11)
08/12/2009Motion for Extension of Time to File Response RSP's unopposed motion for extension of time to file response (3) filed on behalf of Bluegreen Southwest One, L.P.
07/14/2009Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for writ of mandamus due n/l/t 3:00 p.m. on 8/13/09; mlbx rule d/n/a
06/25/2009Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus Brief (12) received on behalf of Texas General Land Office. Submitted by Larry Borella, Acting Director of Oil and Gas Section, Texas General Land Office, P.O. Box 12873, Austin, TX 78701, Phone (512)305-9121
06/23/2009Case forwarded to Court  
06/11/2009Amicus Curiae Brief received On behalf of Maston C. Courtney.  Submitted by Maston C. Courtney of Courtney, Countiss, Brian & Bailey, LLP., PO Box 9238, Amarillo, TX 79106.  Phone 806-372-5569.  Fax 806-372-9761.
05/26/2009Amicus Curiae Brief received Amicus curiae brief in support of Betty Yvon Lesley's petition/review submitted on behalf of Bruce M. Kramer, McGinnis, Lochridge & Kilgore, L.L.P., 1221 McKinney St., Suite 3200, Houston, TX  77010 (Phone) (713) 615-8500, (Fax) (713) 328-1803. (orig & 11)
05/18/2009Appendix Filed attached to petition
05/18/2009Petition for Review PFR appendix attached (12) filed on behalf of Betty Yvon Lesley, et al.
04/21/2009Amended Certificate Amended certificate of conference indicating that the motion for extension of time is unopposed (3) filed on behalf of Betty Yvon Lesley.
04/17/2009Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedM/e/t to file pet/rev is granted.  Pet/rev is due May 18, 2009.
04/16/2009Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed M/E/T to file pet/rev. On behalf of Betty Yvon Lesley, et al. (3)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
12/21/2011Case StoredCase stored.G02 Exhibit Room H-2 (3 vols + 2 boxes)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ginn, RebeccaRespondentMr. David C. McCue
Ms. Mary Therese Sullivan
Kramer, Bruce M.Amicus CuriaeMr. Bruce M. Kramer
Bauer & Christine L. JohnsonRespondentMr. Donald Prichard Bevis Jr.
Mr. James P. McGowen
Bluegreen Southwest One, L.P. RespondentMr. Thomas H. Crofts Jr.
Ms. Laura H. Burney
Mr. Brian Conway Hamilton
Ms. Sharon E. Callaway
Mr. Michael J. Murray
Mr. Matthew D. Bradley
Texas General Land OfficeAmicus CuriaeMr. Larry Grady Borella
McDermott, Kevin M.RespondentMr. Darrell E. Haynes
Lesley, Betty YvonPetitionerMs. Susan R. Richardson
Mr. Charles L. Tighe
Mr. Harold Leroy Hensley Jr.
Mr. Joseph A. Baker
Mr. David W. Lauritzen
Mr. Charles Christopher Aycock
Mr. Robert C. Bledsoe
Chandler & KenRespondentMr. Michael T. Donohue
Mr. Steven R. Shaver
Meierhofer, AngelaRespondentMs. Katherine D. Woodruff
Mayo, Ann S.RespondentMs. Amy Mayo McLin
Veterans Land Board of the State of Texas (VLB)RespondentMs. Barbara Bryant Deane
Mr. C. Andrew Weber
Attorney General Greg W. Abbott
Mr. Daniel T. Hodge
Ms. Priscilla M. Hubenak
Mr. William (Bill) J. Cobb III
Mr. David Preister
Mr. David S. Morales
Courtney, Maston C.Amicus CuriaeMr. Maston C. Courtney
Landowner RespondentMr. Lawrence I. Fleishman
Mr. Darrell E. Haynes
Mr. Stephen Edward Haynes
Mr. Byron L. Woolley
Mr. Robert J. Glasgow
Court of Appeals Information:
REVERSED REND'D REMD'D 
281 SW3d 602, 01-22-09 
11th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Terry McCall 
Trial Court Information
266th District Court 
Erath 
Honorable Charles C. Cooke 
CV-28,679 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site