Eighth Court of Appeals

Case: 08-16-00153-CR    
08-16-00153-CR
07/07/2016
Employment Harmful to Children
Terry Lee Morris 
The State of Texas 
No 
2nd Court of Appeals 
07/07/2016 
02-16-00242-CR 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/08/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
02/07/2017Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/13/2018Case forwarded to higher court 
07/02/2018Petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals 
05/18/2018Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsMotion or Writ Granted
05/02/2018Motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/16/2018Motion for rehearing filed 
03/06/2018Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/06/2018Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing filed 
02/28/2018Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
12/06/2017Order entered 
12/01/2017Letter received 
09/28/2017Submitted 
09/21/2017Letter received 
07/14/2017Record Sent 
07/07/2017Set for submission on briefs 
05/08/2017Case ready to be set 
05/08/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
03/29/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/29/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/24/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/24/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/22/2017Letter received 
02/07/2017Brief filed - oral argument requested 
01/09/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/09/2017Order entered 
01/06/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/09/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/09/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
11/22/2016Letter issued by the court 
11/22/2016Letter issued by the court 
11/09/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/09/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/10/2016Sealed reporters record filed 
10/10/2016Reporters record filed 
10/07/2016Sealed clerk record filed 
10/07/2016Clerks record filed 
07/07/2016Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals 
07/07/2016Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsMotion or Writ Granted
06/17/2016Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/02/2018Appeal to Higher CourtHigher court review
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasDebra A. Windsor
Morris, Terry LeeCriminal - AppellantLisa Mullen
Trial Court Information
396th District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable The Honorable George William Gallagher 
1382399D 
Court Reporter, 396th District Court 
60 Yrs. IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site