Eighth Court of Appeals

Case: 08-15-00315-CR    
08-15-00315-CR
10/06/2015
Theft
John David Najera 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
09/06/2016Reply brief filedAppellant
08/25/2016Brief filed - oral argument requestedState
05/11/2016Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/31/2018Letter filed 
07/27/2018Opinion issuedReversed and Rendered
10/20/2016Submitted 
09/06/2016Reply brief filed 
09/02/2016Set for submission on briefs 
08/25/2016Case ready to be set 
08/25/2016Brief filed - oral argument requested 
08/09/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/09/2016Order entered 
08/09/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
07/11/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/11/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/10/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/10/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/11/2016Brief filed - oral argument requested 
03/22/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/22/2016Order entered 
03/22/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/23/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/23/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/25/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/25/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/28/2015Reporters record filed 
12/28/2015Reporters record filed 
12/09/2015Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/09/2015Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
11/10/2015Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/10/2015Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
11/06/2015Clerks record filed 
10/08/2015Notice of appeal received 
10/06/2015Docketing statement filed 
10/06/2015Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/10/2018StatusMandate to Issue
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasHon. Jaime E. Esparza
Hon. Bryant Francis Cabrera
Najera, John DavidCriminal - AppellantHon. Jaime E. Gandara
Hon. Nicholas C. Vitolo
Trial Court Information
120th District Court 
El Paso 
Honorable Maria Salas-Mendoza 
20130D01090 
Mary Caraveo 
180 days State Jail Division - TDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site