Case: 08-15-00044-CV    
08-15-00044-CV
02/09/2015
Miscellaneous/other civil
Rosa Serrano d/b/a The Lens Factory 
City Bank and Old Republic National Title Insurance Company 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/28/2017Mandate issued 
02/01/2017Motion to reconsider disposedMotion or Writ Denied
02/01/2017Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
01/25/2017Motion to reconsider filed 
01/18/2017Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Denied
01/17/2017Motion filed 
01/13/2017Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing filed 
01/11/2017Motion to reconsider disposedMotion or Writ Denied
12/29/2016Motion to reconsider filed 
12/19/2016Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
12/12/2016Motion filed 
11/30/2016Response filed 
11/30/2016Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/22/2016Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing filed 
10/27/2016Opinion issuedDismissed
10/27/2016Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
10/24/2016Motion received 
10/19/2016Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
10/18/2016Fee paid 
10/17/2016Motion filed 
10/17/2016Letter filed 
10/13/2016Letter filed 
10/12/2016Submitted 
10/05/2016Motion fee due 
10/05/2016Motion to recuse filed 
10/04/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Denied
10/03/2016Letter filed 
10/03/2016Fee paid 
10/03/2016Response filed 
09/30/2016Response filed 
09/29/2016Response filed 
09/28/2016Motion fee due 
09/28/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/14/2016Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
09/14/2016Response filed 
09/07/2016Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
09/06/2016Response filed 
08/31/2016Fee paid 
08/29/2016Motion fee due 
08/29/2016Motion filed 
08/26/2016Motion filed 
08/25/2016Opinion issuedMotion or Writ Denied
08/25/2016Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
08/25/2016Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
08/24/2016Letter received 
08/23/2016Fee paid 
08/23/2016Supplemental clerks record filed 
08/18/2016Record Sent 
08/17/2016Fee paid 
08/16/2016Letter issued by the court 
08/16/2016Order entered 
08/11/2016Motion filed 
08/11/2016Motion to stay disposedMotion or Writ Denied
08/10/2016Response filed 
08/05/2016Order entered 
08/05/2016Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
07/28/2016Motion filed 
07/28/2016Response filed 
07/28/2016Reply to response or motion filed 
07/25/2016Response filed 
07/25/2016Response filed 
07/22/2016Response filed 
07/19/2016Response filed 
07/18/2016Motion filed 
07/13/2016Letter filed 
07/13/2016Response filed 
06/30/2016Motion to stay filed 
06/16/2016Order entered 
06/16/2016Motion disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/15/2016Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
06/14/2016Motion filed 
06/14/2016Response filed 
06/08/2016Order entered 
06/08/2016Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
06/07/2016Hearing record filed 
06/07/2016Letter filed 
06/06/2016Hearing record filed 
06/01/2016Motion filed 
05/31/2016Letter issued by the court 
05/26/2016Motion filed 
05/20/2016Response filed 
05/17/2016Record Sent 
05/17/2016Order entered 
05/16/2016Supplemental clerks record filed 
05/13/2016Contest to an affidavit of inability to pay, filed in COA 
05/13/2016Contest to an affidavit of inability to pay, filed in COA 
05/11/2016Letter filed 
05/03/2016Order entered 
05/03/2016Hearing record filed 
04/28/2016Hearing record filed 
04/27/2016Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/15/2016Motion filed 
04/13/2016Motion filed 
04/08/2016Document filed 
04/07/2016Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/07/2016Order entered 
04/07/2016Motion to compel disposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/04/2016Letter filed 
04/04/2016Motion filed 
03/24/2016Motion filed 
03/24/2016Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/23/2016Motion to compel filed 
03/18/2016Letter filed 
03/10/2016Motion filed 
03/08/2016Order entered 
02/29/2016Letter filed 
01/20/2016Letter filed 
01/20/2016Motion to reconsider disposedMotion or Writ Denied
01/07/2016Motion to reconsider filed 
01/05/2016Motion for temporary relief disposedMotion or Writ Denied
01/05/2016Motion for temporary relief filed 
12/02/2015Order entered 
12/02/2015Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/30/2015Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
11/10/2015Motion to supplement record disposedMotion or Writ Denied
11/09/2015Response filed 
10/28/2015Motion to supplement record filed 
10/22/2015Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/22/2015Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
10/21/2015Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
10/21/2015Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
10/21/2015Response filed 
10/21/2015Response filed 
10/20/2015Response filed 
10/20/2015Response filed 
10/14/2015Motion filed 
10/08/2015Appearance of counsel 
10/07/2015Motion filed 
10/07/2015Amended notice of appeal filed 
10/07/2015Motion to stay disposedMotion or Writ Denied
10/02/2015Motion to stay filed 
10/02/2015Docketing statement filed 
09/22/2015Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
09/18/2015Motion filed 
08/25/2015Motion disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/14/2015Motion filed 
08/10/2015Motion disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/10/2015Order entered 
08/07/2015Motion filed 
08/06/2015Letter filed 
07/30/2015Letter filed 
07/22/2015Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
07/21/2015Motion filed 
07/15/2015Motion filed 
07/02/2015Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
07/01/2015Motion filed 
07/01/2015Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/01/2015Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
04/24/2015Supplemental clerks record filed 
04/14/2015Order entered 
04/14/2015Amended notice of appeal filed 
04/14/2015Amended notice of appeal filed 
04/10/2015Notice of appeal received 
04/10/2015Notice of appeal received 
04/07/2015Letter filed 
03/30/2015Supplemental clerks record filed 
03/27/2015Clerks record filed 
02/25/2015Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
02/24/2015Motion to reconsider filed 
02/20/2015Order entered 
02/20/2015Motion for emergency relief disposedMotion or Writ Denied
02/19/2015Motion for emergency relief filed 
02/17/2015Response filed 
02/09/2015Affidavit of indigence for costs of appeal filed in court of appeals 
02/09/2015Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/28/2017RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Old Republic National Title Insurance CompanyAppelleeHon. S. Anthony Safi
Hon. Darryl Vereen
Hon. Shannon J. Crenshaw
Pellicano Business Park, L.L.C., a Texas CorporationAppelleeHon. Burton I. Cohen
City Bank Texas, N.A.AppelleeHon. Lawrence Matthew Doss  
Hon. Michael Andrew Stewart
Serrano, Rosa AppellantRosa Serrano
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 7 
El Paso 
Honorable The Honorable Virgil Mulanax 
2015-DCV-1079/2013-DCV-3139 
Araceli Cortez 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site