Seventh Court of Appeals

Case: 07-16-00245-CR    
07-16-00245-CR
06/23/2016
Engaging in Organized Criminal Activity
Kenyetta Danyell Walker 
The State of Texas 
No 
9th Court of Appeals 
06/23/2016 
09-16-00214-CR 
7th Court of Appeals 
06/23/2016 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
03/16/2017Supplemental brief filedState
03/03/2017Supplemental brief filedAppellant
01/04/2017Brief filed - oral argument requestedState
10/27/2016Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/01/2017Case forwarded to higher court 
05/26/2017Petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals 
04/28/2017Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsMotion granted; further extensions disfavored
03/30/2017Memorandum opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
03/16/2017Supplemental brief filed 
03/10/2017Motion for extension of time to file supplemental brief disposedMotion Granted
03/09/2017Motion for extension of time to file supplemental brief filed 
03/07/2017Submitted 
03/03/2017Supplemental brief filed 
02/28/2017Letter issued by the court 
02/14/2017Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
01/05/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion Granted
01/04/2017Case ready to be set 
01/04/2017Brief filed - oral argument requested 
01/04/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/28/2016Corrected document requested 
11/28/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion Granted
11/28/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/27/2016Brief filed - oral argument requested 
10/11/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion Granted
10/07/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/15/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion Granted
09/14/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/13/2016Notice of late brief 
08/05/2016Exhibits filed 
08/05/2016Exhibits filed 
08/05/2016Reporters record filed 
07/29/2016Clerks record filed 
07/05/2016Document filed 
06/30/2016Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
06/23/2016Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals 
06/23/2016Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsCase transferred to another COA
06/23/2016Order entered 
06/19/2016Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
06/17/2016Notice of appeal w/form from trial clerk 
06/17/2016Trial court certification filed 
06/09/2016Sentence imposed in the trial court 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/01/2017Appeal to Higher CourtHigher court review
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Walker, Kenyetta DanyellCriminal - AppellantChristine R. Brown-Zeto
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasKrispen Walker
Trial Court Information
163rd District Court 
Orange 
Honorable Dennis Powell 
B-150206-R 
Sarah K. Moreland 
42 yrs TDCJ-ID 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site