Seventh Court of Appeals

Case: 07-16-00230-CV    
07-16-00230-CV
06/15/2016
Oil & Gas
Dimock Operating Company and Joe W. Dimock d/b/a Dimock Petroleum 
Sutherland Energy Co., LLC. 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
12/14/2016Reply brief filedAppellant
11/28/2016Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
09/28/2016Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/18/2018Response filed 
09/13/2018Response requested by the court 
09/07/2018Motion to dismiss filed 
08/31/2018Petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtMotion or Writ Denied
07/05/2018Sent to publisher 
06/07/2018Petition for review filed in Supreme Court 
04/24/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed,Reversed & Remanded to Trial Court
04/24/2018Opinion withdrawn 
04/24/2018Motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/24/2018Motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/06/2018Motion disposedFiling is Moot
04/05/2018Motion filed 
03/30/2018Response filed 
03/27/2018Motion for rehearing filed 
03/22/2018Response requested by the court 
03/20/2018Motion for rehearing filed 
03/13/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed,Reversed & Remanded to Trial Court
10/11/2017Submitted 
09/29/2017Letter issued by the court 
09/15/2017Set for submission on oral argument 
12/14/2016Reply brief filed 
11/28/2016Case ready to be set 
11/28/2016Brief filed - oral argument requested 
10/31/2016Letter filed 
10/28/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion Granted
10/28/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/30/2016Record Sent 
09/29/2016Letter filed 
09/28/2016Brief filed - oral argument requested 
09/28/2016Motion to exceed brief length disposedMotion Granted
09/27/2016Letter filed 
09/27/2016Motion to exceed brief length filed 
08/26/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion Granted
08/26/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/17/2016Record Sent 
08/17/2016Letter filed 
08/16/2016Supplemental clerks record filed 
07/29/2016Record checked out 
07/29/2016Letter filed 
07/28/2016Supplemental reporters record filed 
07/21/2016Notice filed 
07/06/2016Record checked out 
07/06/2016Letter filed 
07/05/2016Clerks record filed 
07/05/2016Clerks record filed 
06/23/2016Reporters record filed 
06/23/2016Motion to transfer record disposedMotion Granted
06/22/2016Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
06/22/2016Docketing statement filed 
06/21/2016Fee paid 
06/21/2016Motion to transfer record filed 
06/15/2016Fee requested 
06/15/2016Docketing statement requested 
06/15/2016Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
06/14/2016Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
06/01/2016Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/08/2018Appeal to Higher CourtHigher court review
09/24/2018MotionMotion to dismiss
09/24/2018StatusResponse due regarding jurisdiction
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Sutherland Energy Co., LLC.AppelleeChris Lehman
Jerry L. Ewing, Jr.
Dimock, Joe W.AppellantStanley R. Watson
Cornell D. Curtis
John H. Lovell
Barbara A. Bauernfeind
Dimock Operating CompanyAppellantBarbara A. Bauernfeind
Stanley R. Watson
Cornell D. Curtis
John H. Lovell
Trial Court Information
46th District Court 
Hardeman 
Honorable Dan Mike Bird 
11098 
Gloria Judd Bourland 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site