Seventh Court of Appeals

Case: 07-14-00014-CV    
07-14-00014-CV
01/21/2014
Miscellaneous/other civil
Rebecca Terrell and Chandrashekhar Thanedar 
Pampa Independent School District 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
09/17/2015Supplemental brief filedAppellant
09/08/2015Reply brief filedAppellant
06/26/2015Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
03/26/2015Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/03/2016Letter issued by the court 
08/01/2016Letter filed 
06/03/2016Mandate acknowledged by trial court clerk 
06/02/2016Mandate issued 
05/17/2016Sent to publisher 
03/15/2016Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled motion
03/14/2016Reply to response or motion filed 
03/07/2016Response filed 
02/24/2016Response requested by the court 
02/16/2016Motion for rehearing filed 
02/01/2016Memorandum opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
02/01/2016Submitted 
02/01/2016Opinion withdrawn 
02/01/2016Motion for rehearing grantedMotion Granted
01/14/2016Reply to response or motion filed 
12/28/2015Response filed 
12/15/2015Response requested by the court 
12/14/2015Motion for rehearing filed 
12/04/2015Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposedMotion Granted
11/12/2015Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing filed 
10/29/2015Memorandum opinion issuedDismissed-Want of Jurisdiction
10/01/2015Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
09/18/2015Motion to file supplemental brief disposedMotion Granted
09/17/2015Supplemental brief filed 
09/17/2015Motion to file supplemental brief filed 
09/17/2015Corrected document requested 
09/09/2015Submitted 
09/09/2015Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedMotion Granted
09/08/2015Motion to transfer record filed 
09/08/2015Reply brief filed 
09/08/2015Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
08/19/2015Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
07/06/2015Letter filed 
07/01/2015Letter filed 
06/30/2015Letter filed 
06/29/2015Letter filed 
06/26/2015Case ready to be set 
06/26/2015Brief filed - oral argument requested 
05/21/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion Granted
05/21/2015Response filed 
05/21/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/22/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion Granted
04/21/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/26/2015Brief filed - oral argument requested 
03/24/2015Supplemental clerks record filed 
03/24/2015Amended notice of appeal filed 
03/17/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/11/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/10/2015Record checked out 
03/09/2015Letter filed 
03/05/2015Supplemental clerks record filed 
02/10/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion Granted
02/06/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/14/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion Granted
01/07/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/10/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion Granted
12/09/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
11/10/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion Granted
11/07/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/09/2014Record checked out 
10/09/2014Record checked out 
10/09/2014Letter filed 
10/09/2014Exhibits filed 
10/08/2014Supplemental clerks record filed 
10/08/2014Case reinstated 
10/08/2014Reporters record filed 
09/17/2014Sent to publisher 
09/08/2014Letter filed 
08/26/2014Motion for emergency relief disposedMotion or Writ Denied
08/25/2014Motion for emergency relief filed 
08/13/2014Letter issued by the court 
08/12/2014Record checked out 
08/12/2014Letter filed 
08/11/2014Supplemental reporters record filed 
08/08/2014Letter filed 
08/08/2014Letter filed 
08/01/2014Document filed 
07/16/2014Mandate acknowledged by trial court clerk 
07/14/2014Mandate issued 
07/14/2014Memorandum opinion issuedAbated
07/14/2014Record checked out 
07/14/2014Letter filed 
07/11/2014Submitted 
07/10/2014Supplemental reporters record filedStruck
07/03/2014Response filed 
06/26/2014Extension of time to file reporters record filedFiling is Moot
06/25/2014Response filed 
06/24/2014Response filed 
06/24/2014Motion filed 
06/24/2014Letter filed 
06/13/2014Letter issued by the court 
06/06/2014Motion filed 
06/04/2014Response filed 
06/04/2014Corrected document requested 
06/03/2014Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
05/30/2014Supplemental clerks record filed 
05/29/2014Letter issued by the court 
05/28/2014Letter issued by the court 
05/28/2014Motion disposedMotion Granted
05/05/2014Letter filed 
05/02/2014Letter filed 
05/02/2014Document filed 
04/30/2014Motion filed 
04/22/2014Motion filed 
04/21/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion Granted
04/18/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/08/2014Record checked out 
04/08/2014Letter filed 
03/25/2014Extension of time to file clerks record disposedFiling is Moot
03/25/2014Clerks record filed 
03/24/2014Response filed 
03/24/2014Reporters record filed 
03/21/2014Extension of time to file clerks record filed 
02/28/2014Letter issued by the court 
02/28/2014Extension of time to file clerks record disposedMotion Granted
02/28/2014Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion Granted
02/20/2014Extension of time to file clerks record filed 
02/19/2014Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
02/03/2014Docketing statement filed 
01/21/2014Fee paid 
01/21/2014Fee requested 
01/21/2014Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
01/17/2014Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
11/21/2013Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
10/25/2013Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/02/2016Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Thanedar, Chandrashekhar AppellantChandrashekhar Thanedar
Pampa Independent School DistrictAppelleeW. Wade Arnold  
Jennie C. Knapp  
Terrell, Rebecca AppellantRebecca Terrell
Trial Court Information
223rd District Court 
Gray 
Honorable Abe Lopez 
35,621 
Karen Morris 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site