Seventh Court of Appeals

Case: 07-11-00427-CV    
07-11-00427-CV
10/13/2011
Miscellaneous civil
Bert Wallace 
Kent County, Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
03/28/2012Reply brief filedAppellant
03/05/2012Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
01/30/2012Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/02/2013Mandate issued 
10/22/2013Sent to publisher 
09/11/2013Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled motion
09/04/2013Motion for rehearing filed 
08/21/2013Memorandum opinion issuedReversed and Rendered, Reversed and Remanded
12/21/2012Notice filed 
12/03/2012Submitted 
11/29/2012Motion to postpone oral argument disposedDENIED
11/29/2012Motion to postpone oral argument filed 
11/08/2012Set for submission on oral argument 
03/28/2012Reply brief filed 
03/05/2012Case ready to be set 
03/05/2012Brief filed - oral argument requested 
03/01/2012Record checked in 
02/10/2012Motion for oral argument disposedMotion Granted
02/08/2012Motion for oral argument filed 
02/02/2012Record checked out 
01/31/2012Record checked in 
01/30/2012Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
01/11/2012Record checked out 
12/30/2011Clerks record filed 
11/14/2011Reporters record filed 
10/13/2011Fee paid 
10/13/2011Docketing statement filed 
10/13/2011Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
10/06/2011Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
09/14/2011Judgment signed by trial court judge 
09/17/2010Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/01/2020RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
12/02/2013Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Wallace, BertAppellantZachary S. Brady
Victor H. Wanjura
Amber S. Miller
Kent County, TexasAppelleeSusan Desmarais Bonnen
Greg Abbott
Robert T. Bass
Trial Court Information
39th District Court 
Kent 
Honorable Shane Hadaway 
1681 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site