Seventh Court of Appeals

Case: 07-09-00392-CV    
07-09-00392-CV
12/21/2009
Contract
Betty Domingo 
Cindy Skidmore, Donna Walker, Estella Barron, Brenda Mitchell, Gina Schultz and Sharla Pierce, and LGroup, a Texas General Partnership 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
06/21/2010Reply brief filedAppellant
06/02/2010Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
06/01/2010Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
04/29/2010Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/18/2011Mandate issued 
11/01/2011Sent to publisher 
08/31/2011Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
04/26/2011Response filed 
04/25/2011Response filed 
04/25/2011Supplemental clerks record filed 
04/11/2011Order enteredShow Cause
02/07/2011Submitted 
01/14/2011Set for submission on oral argument 
06/21/2010Reply brief filed 
06/02/2010Case ready to be set 
06/02/2010Brief filed - oral argument requested 
06/01/2010Brief filed - oral argument requested 
05/07/2010Motion for oral argument disposedMotion Granted
05/07/2010Motion for oral argument filed 
04/29/2010Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
04/27/2010Record checked in 
04/22/2010Supplemental clerks record filed 
04/08/2010Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion Granted
04/05/2010Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/23/2010Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion Granted
03/23/2010Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/15/2010Record checked out 
02/18/2010Reporters record filed 
01/22/2010Clerks record filed 
01/21/2010Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion Granted
01/21/2010Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
01/15/2010Clerks record filed 
01/15/2010Motion to transfer record disposedMotion Granted
01/11/2010Motion to transfer record filed 
12/31/2009Docketing statement filed 
12/29/2009Fee paid 
12/21/2009Fee requested 
12/21/2009Docketing statement requested 
12/21/2009Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
12/16/2009Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
11/20/2009Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/01/2019RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
11/18/2011Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Domingo, BettyAppellantDavid L. Craft
Arthur Walker
LGroup, a Texas General PartnershipAppelleeZachary S. Brady
Robert L. Duncan
Mitchell, BrendaAppelleeAmber S. Miller
Zachary S. Brady
Robert L. Duncan
Walker, DonnaAppelleeRobert L. Duncan
Zachary S. Brady
Schultz, GinaAppelleeRobert L. Duncan
Zachary S. Brady
Barron, EstellaAppelleeZachary S. Brady
Robert L. Duncan
Pierce, SharlaAppelleeZachary S. Brady
Robert L. Duncan
Skidmore, CindyAppelleeRobert L. Duncan
Arlene C. Matthews
Zachary S. Brady
Trial Court Information
237th District Court 
Lubbock 
Honorable Les Hatch 
2006-535,854 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site