Supreme Court

Case: 07-0639    
07-0639
08/13/2007
Granted Motion to file Certified question
DON'S BUILDING SUPPLY, INC. 
ONEBEACON INSURANCE COMPANY, AS ASSIGNEE OF POTOMAC INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/29/2008Motion for RehearingAppellee's motion for rehearing of a cause filedApe's mo/re.  On behalf of OneBeacon Insurance Company.  (12)
02/11/2008Additional citations received.Appellant in caseCiting article in Don's Principal Brief beginning at Note 44 and in its reply brief at Note 39.  Second matter of citation, Green v. County Commissioners, 450 F.Supp.2d 1273 (E.D. Okla. 2006).  On behalf of Don's Building Supply Inc. (12)
02/05/2008Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)Filed on behalf of Union Insurance company and Union Standard Lloyds, (12).  Submitted by Don Martinson of Leslie Echols Pitts, Two Energy Square, 4849 Greenville Ave., Suite 1300, Dallas, TX 75206, Tel.(214)369-1300.
12/27/2007Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)On behalf of Cooper Industries, Ltd, Key Energy Services, Inc., McDermott International, Inc., NL Industries, Inc., Indalex Inc. and Honeywell International Inc.  Submitted by Paul Ridley of Kirkpatrick & Lockhart Preston Gates Ellis LLP; 2828 N Harwood St, Ste 1800, Dallas TX 75201.  Phone 214-939-9400.  Fax 214-939-4949.
11/12/2007Reply BriefAppellant in caseAnt's reply brief on the merits.  On behalf of Don's Building Supply, Inc. (12)
10/17/2007Brief on the MeritsAppellee in caseApe's brief on the merits.  On behalf of OneBeacon Insurance Co. (12)
09/27/2007Appendix FiledAppellant in caseAppendix of Ant's brief on the merits.  On behalf of Don's Building Supply, Inc. (12)
09/27/2007Brief on the MeritsAppellant in caseAnt's brief on the merits.  On behalf of Don's Building Supply, Inc. (12)
08/13/2007Notice of Appeal filedAppellant in caseNotice of appeal filed on behalf of DON' BUILDING SUPPLY INC.
08/13/2007Certified Question filedU. S. Certified QuestionCertified question filed by the 5th Circuit Court of Appeals on behalf of Don's Building Supply Inc.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/10/2009Case Stored G02 Row 29 A-2 (1 vol)
11/14/2008Motion for Rehearing - DisposedDenied 
10/06/2008Letter Filed Ant's response waiver to mo/re of cause (orig &3)
09/29/2008Case forwarded to Court  
09/29/2008Motion for Rehearing Ape's mo/re.  On behalf of OneBeacon Insurance Company.  (12)
09/18/2008Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedApe's m/e/t to file mo/re is granted.   Mo/re is due September 29, 2008.  Further Requests will be disfavored.
09/16/2008Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing APE's unopposed m/e/t to file mo/re (12) filed on behalf of OneBeacon Ins. Co.
08/29/2008Opinion issuedCertified question answered by the Court 
02/13/2008Electronic copies of brief posted to website #07063904  Amicus Brief - Union Insurance Company & Union Standard Lloyds  Received: 02/05/08
02/11/2008Additional citations received. Citing article in Don's Principal Brief beginning at Note 44 and in its reply brief at Note 39.  Second matter of citation, Green v. County Commissioners, 450 F.Supp.2d 1273 (E.D. Okla. 2006).  On behalf of Don's Building Supply Inc. (12)
02/07/2008Oral argument  Appellant represented by Mr. Thomas B. Alleman (Winstead PC), from Dallas.
Appellee represented by Mr. Gene F. Creely II (Cozen O’Connor), from Austin.
02/05/2008Amicus Curiae Brief received Filed on behalf of Union Insurance company and Union Standard Lloyds, (12).  Submitted by Don Martinson of Leslie Echols Pitts, Two Energy Square, 4849 Greenville Ave., Suite 1300, Dallas, TX 75206, Tel.(214)369-1300.
12/27/2007Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received OA form from Thomas B. Alleman of Winstead PC from Dallas TX - counsel for Don's Building Supply, Inc.
12/27/2007Amicus Curiae Brief received On behalf of Cooper Industries, Ltd, Key Energy Services, Inc., McDermott International, Inc., NL Industries, Inc., Indalex Inc. and Honeywell International Inc.  Submitted by Paul Ridley of Kirkpatrick & Lockhart Preston Gates Ellis LLP; 2828 N Harwood St, Ste 1800, Dallas TX 75201.  Phone 214-939-9400.  Fax 214-939-4949.
12/14/2007Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentSet for OA on 2/7/08; Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
11/12/2007Electronic copies of brief posted to website #07063903  Appellant's Reply Brief  Filed:  11/12/07
11/12/2007Reply Brief Ant's reply brief on the merits.  On behalf of Don's Building Supply, Inc. (12)
11/07/2007Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed m/e/t to file reply brief on the merits granted.  Brief due 11/12/07; mlbx rule d/n/a.  Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored.
11/01/2007Motion to Extend Time to File Reply filed Unopposed m/e/t to file reply brief on the merits.  On behalf of Don's Building Supply, Inc. (12)
10/22/2007Electronic copies of brief posted to website #07063902  Appellee's Brief   Filed:  10/17/07
10/22/2007Electronic copies of brief posted to website #07063901  Appellant's Brief  Filed:  09/27/07
10/17/2007Brief on the Merits Ape's brief on the merits.  On behalf of OneBeacon Insurance Co. (12)
09/27/2007Appendix Filed Appendix of Ant's brief on the merits.  On behalf of Don's Building Supply, Inc. (12)
09/27/2007Brief on the Merits Ant's brief on the merits.  On behalf of Don's Building Supply, Inc. (12)
08/28/2007Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Ant br due n/l/t 3:00 p.m. on 9/27/07; Ape br due 10/17/07; Reply br due 11/1/07; mlbx rule d/n/a
08/24/2007Certified Question accepted  
08/24/2007Certified Question disposedCertified Question acceptedOA will be set at a later date.
08/15/2007Call received from the Burdin Mediations (s/w Margie) to let us know that they are no longer involve in this case and the atty who was handling this case as a mediator is no longer working with them.  Take off notice.  
08/14/2007Notice requesting filing fee Fee request sent to both parties regarding filing fee for certified question.  ($62.50 from each side)  
08/13/2007Case Record Filed  Consists of: ant's br. (1), ape's br. (1), ant's reply br. (1), letters of ant's (4), letters of ape's (2)
08/13/2007Docketing statement filed On behalf of DON' BUILDING SUPPLY INC. (attached to notice of appeal)
08/13/2007Notice of Appeal filed Notice of appeal filed on behalf of DON' BUILDING SUPPLY INC.
08/13/2007Certified Question filed Certified question filed by the 5th Circuit Court of Appeals on behalf of Don's Building Supply Inc.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
03/10/2009Case StoredCase stored.G02 Row 29 A-2 (1 vol)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ross NMI HostetterOther interested party Mr. J. Ross Hostetter
Don's Building Supply Inc.AppellantMr. Thomas B. Alleman
Cooper Industries, LtdAmicus CuriaeMr. Paul E. Ridley
OneBeacon Insurance CompanyAppelleeMr. Marcus Jarrett Coleman
Mr. Tim Headley
Mr. Gene F. Creely II
Mr. Gregory S. Hudson
Ms. Michelle Macarthur Castro
Mr. Philip Roderick Lamb
Union Insurance companyAmicus CuriaeMr. Don Martinson
Court of Appeals Information:
 
 
 
 
Trial Court Information
 
 
 
06-10727 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site