Fifth Court of Appeals

Case: 05-18-00860-CV    
05-18-00860-CV
07/27/2018
Contract
BBVA Compass and Sam Meade 
David Bagwell, Individually and as Trustee of the David S. Bagwell Trust, Broughton Limited Partnership, Old Grove Limited Partnership and Broadland Limited Partnership and Marilyn D. Garner, Chapter 7 Trustee of The Estate of The David Bagwell Company and the Estate of Evermore Communities, Ltd. 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/14/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
11/12/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/25/2018Record due 
10/24/2018Appellants brief due 
10/04/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/03/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/24/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
08/22/2018Appearance of counsel 
08/08/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
07/31/2018Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
07/27/2018Docketing statement filed 
07/27/2018Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
07/27/2018Fee paid 
07/27/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
07/26/2018Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
06/27/2018Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/27/2018StatusAppellant brief due
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Marilyn D. Garner, et al.AppelleeDavid S. Coale  
Peyton Healey  
BBVA Compass and Sam MeadeAppellantNina Cortell
Rachel Anne Ekery
Michael A. Logan
Kent G. Rutter  
Michael A. Hatchell
Anne McGowan Johnson  
Kenneth Charles Riney
Jeffrey S. Seeburger
Wallace B. Jefferson
David Bagwell, et al.AppelleeJeffrey Thomas Hall
Kristy Pesnell Campbell
Derrick S. Boyd
Jeffrey S. Levinger  
Trial Court Information
101st Judicial District Court 
Dallas 
Honorable Staci Williams 
DC-14-00991  
Thu Bui 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site