Fifth Court of Appeals

Case: 05-18-00567-CV    
05-18-00567-CV
05/16/2018
Damages
Darlene C. Amrhein 
Attorney Lennie F. Bollinger, and Worminton & Bollinger Law Firm 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/30/2018Brief received - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/16/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
11/06/2018Notice filed 
11/06/2018Motion to exceed brief length disposedMotion or Writ Denied
11/05/2018Appellants brief due 
10/30/2018Brief received - oral argument requested 
10/30/2018Motion to exceed brief length filed 
10/22/2018Letter filed 
10/04/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
10/02/2018Motion filed 
09/28/2018Letter filed 
09/26/2018No reporters record filed in civil case 
09/11/2018Letter filed 
09/11/2018Record due 
09/10/2018Letter received 
09/07/2018Letter filed 
09/07/2018Letter issued by the court 
09/06/2018Letter filed 
08/07/2018Letter received 
07/31/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
07/06/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
07/06/2018Docketing statement filed 
07/06/2018Notice filed 
06/29/2018Response filed 
06/29/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Denied
06/19/2018Motion filed 
06/01/2018Statement of inability to afford costs filed in the court of appeals 
06/01/2018Docketing statement filed 
06/01/2018Docketing statement filed 
05/17/2018Appearance of counsel 
05/17/2018Letter filed 
05/16/2018Fee requested 
05/16/2018Docketing statement due 
05/16/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
05/15/2018Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
05/14/2018Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/30/2018StatusClerk record due per court order
12/10/2018StatusAmended brief due
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Attorney Lennie F. Bollinger, and Worminton & Bollinger Law FirmAppelleeKatherine Khristine Elrich
Carrie Johnson Phaneuf
Jennifer Smiley
Balistreri-Amrhein, Darlene C.AppellantDarlene C. Balistreri-Amrhein
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 6 
Collin 
Honorable Jay Adam Bender 
006-02654-2017 
Jennifer Corley 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site