Fifth Court of Appeals

Case: 05-18-00545-CR    
05-18-00545-CR
05/09/2018
Poss of a Controlled Substance
Thomas Damien McLean 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/10/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
07/03/2018Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/24/2018Submitted 
09/10/2018Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
09/06/2018Motion for oral argument disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/04/2018Motion for oral argument filed 
08/31/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
08/31/2018State brief due 
08/10/2018Case ready to be set 
08/10/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
08/07/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/06/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/02/2018State brief due 
07/06/2018Appellants brief due 
07/03/2018Brief filed - oral argument requested 
06/26/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
06/25/2018Order enteredOtherwise Disposed
06/24/2018Reporters record due 
06/06/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
05/25/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
05/25/2018Record due 
05/23/2018Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
05/22/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
05/22/2018Docketing statement filed 
05/09/2018Docketing statement due 
05/09/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
04/18/2018Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
03/26/2018Judgment signed by trial court judge 
03/26/2018Trial court certification filed 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/24/2018SubmittedSubmitted on oral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
McLean, Thomas DamienCriminal - AppellantPeter I Morgan
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasNoble Dan Walker Jr.
Allison Flanagan
Trial Court Information
196th Judicial District Court 
Hunt 
Honorable Andrew Bench 
31671 
Edwin Walker 
20 years in TDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site