Fifth Court of Appeals

Case: 05-18-00503-CV    
05-18-00503-CV
05/03/2018
Miscellaneous/other civil
Gwendolyn Gabriel 
Merry Outlaw 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/19/2018Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
07/03/2018Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
07/02/2018Brief received - oral argument requestedAppellant
06/22/2018Brief was not filedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/15/2018Order enteredOtherwise Disposed
10/24/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
10/19/2018Brief filed - oral argument requested 
10/19/2018Appellees brief due 
10/12/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
09/21/2018Motion to withdraw attorney filed 
09/20/2018Appearance of counsel 
09/17/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
09/13/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/04/2018Case ready to be set 
09/04/2018Appellees brief due 
08/06/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
08/03/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/02/2018Fee paid 
08/02/2018Appellees brief due 
07/25/2018Fee requested 
07/03/2018Brief filed - oral argument requested 
07/03/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/02/2018Brief received - oral argument requested 
07/02/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/22/2018Brief was not filed 
06/20/2018Appellants brief due 
06/11/2018Record due 
05/21/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
05/18/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
05/03/2018Fee requested 
05/03/2018Docketing statement due 
05/03/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
05/02/2018Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
04/12/2018Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/04/2018At IssueReady to set for oral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Outlaw, MerryAppelleeMalcolm Deon Dishongh
Gabriel, GwendolynAppellantJohn Nation  
Trial Court Information
116th Judicial District Court 
Dallas 
Honorable Tonya Parker 
DC-18-02456 
Lanetta J. Williams 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site