Fifth Court of Appeals

Case: 05-18-00462-CV    
05-18-00462-CV
04/20/2018
Damages
SIG-TX Assets, LLC d/b/a Lincoln Funeral Home 
Beatrice Serrato, Individually, Beatrice Serrato, as Mother and Next Friend of M.S., A Minor Child, Phillip Serrato, and Sylvia Ramirez 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/15/2018Reply brief filedAppellant
07/19/2018Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
06/05/2018Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/15/2018Order enteredOtherwise Disposed
11/14/2018Objection filed 
10/12/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
08/15/2018Reply brief filed 
08/15/2018Reply brief due 
08/08/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
08/06/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
07/19/2018Case ready to be set 
07/19/2018Brief filed - oral argument requested 
07/19/2018Appellees brief due 
07/05/2018Appellees brief due 
07/03/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
07/02/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
07/02/2018Fee requested 
07/02/2018Motion for extension received 
06/05/2018Brief filed - oral argument requested 
06/05/2018Appellants brief due 
05/22/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
05/22/2018Appellants brief due 
05/18/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/03/2018Docketing statement filed 
05/02/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
05/02/2018No reporters record filed in civil case 
04/30/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
04/30/2018Record due 
04/24/2018Fee paid 
04/23/2018Fee requested 
04/23/2018Docketing statement due 
04/23/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
04/20/2018Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
04/20/2018Case began in court of appeals 
04/04/2018Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/19/2018At IssueReady to set for oral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
SIG-TX Assets, LLC d/b/a Lincoln Funeral HomeAppellantAnthony Golz
John Parker Fauntleroy Jr.
Beatrice Serrato, et alAppelleeRussell Button
Ashley Washington
Trial Court Information
95th Judicial District Court 
Dallas 
Honorable Ken Molberg 
DC-17-17209 
Laura Weed 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site