Fifth Court of Appeals

Case: 05-18-00276-CR    
05-18-00276-CR
03/13/2018
Poss of a Controlled Substance
Cara Dawn York 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/24/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/01/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
11/01/2018Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
11/01/2018Order enteredOtherwise Disposed
10/25/2018Submitted 
09/19/2018Set for submission on briefs 
09/07/2018Pro Se response to Anders brief 
08/23/2018State brief due 
08/07/2018Letter issued by the court 
07/26/2018Motion to withdraw attorney filed 
07/25/2018Letter filed 
07/25/2018Case ready to be set 
07/25/2018Letter received 
07/25/2018Appellants brief due 
07/24/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
07/16/2018Clerks record due 
06/25/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
06/25/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
06/22/2018No reporters record filed in criminal case 
06/14/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
06/14/2018Record due 
06/12/2018Motion for extension of time to file record filed 
04/16/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
04/13/2018Docketing statement filed 
04/13/2018Motion filed 
03/13/2018Docketing statement due 
03/13/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
03/09/2018Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
03/09/2018Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
02/14/2018Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/11/2019StatusMandate to Issue
11/01/2043RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasJohn R. Rolater Jr.
Greg Willis
York, Cara DawnCriminal - AppellantCara Dawn York
Maria Tsao Tu
Trial Court Information
380th Judicial District Court 
Collin 
Honorable Benjamin N. Smith 
380-80223-2011 
Karla Kimbrell 
180 days TDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site