Fifth Court of Appeals

Case: 05-18-00239-CV    
05-18-00239-CV
03/06/2018
Damages
Barbara Stegall, Individually, and on behalf of The Estate of Joe Stegall 
TML Multistate Intergovernmental Employee Benefits Pool, Inc., and UMR, Inc. 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/08/2018Reply brief filedAppellant
09/18/2018Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
09/18/2018Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
08/20/2018Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/12/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
10/08/2018Reply brief filed 
09/19/2018Appellees brief due 
09/18/2018Case ready to be set 
09/18/2018Brief filed - oral argument requested 
09/18/2018Brief filed - oral argument requested 
08/20/2018Brief filed - oral argument requested 
08/20/2018Appellants brief due 
08/17/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/16/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/16/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
08/16/2018Appellants brief due 
07/31/2018Appearance of counsel 
07/30/2018Letter received 
07/20/2018Response filed 
07/19/2018No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record 
07/17/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
06/01/2018No clerks record filed in civil case 
05/30/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
05/30/2018Record due 
03/28/2018Docketing statement filed 
03/28/2018Corrected document requested 
03/27/2018Fee paid 
03/07/2018Fee requested 
03/07/2018Docketing statement due 
03/06/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
03/01/2018Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
03/01/2018Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
01/30/2018Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/18/2018SubmissionOral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Barbara Stegall, Individually, and on behalf of The Estate of Joe StegallAppellantBryan Rogers Haynes
Andrea Kelly Bouressa  
J. Mitchell Little
TML MultistateAppelleeStephanie Holden
Jack Wilson Higdon
Barry Abrams
UMR, Inc.AppelleeNicole Munoz
Timothy A. Daniels
Ray E Walker
Andrew G. Jubinsky
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 4 
Dallas 
Honorable Ken Tapscott 
CC-16-05440-D 
Coral L. Wahlen 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site