Fifth Court of Appeals

Case: 05-18-00130-CV    
05-18-00130-CV
02/06/2018
Contract
Bryan Inman 
Henry Loe, Jr., James Morrison and Patrick Henry Medical, LLC 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
06/11/2018Reply brief filedAppellant
05/22/2018Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
05/18/2018Brief received - oral argument not requestedAppellee
04/09/2018Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
04/06/2018Brief received - oral argument requestedAppellant
04/06/2018Brief was not filedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/14/2018Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
11/14/2018Order enteredOtherwise Disposed
10/03/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
06/11/2018Reply brief filed 
05/22/2018Brief filed - oral argument requested 
05/22/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/18/2018Brief received - oral argument not requested 
05/18/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/09/2018Case ready to be set 
05/09/2018Appellees brief due 
04/26/2018Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
04/25/2018Notice filed 
04/09/2018Brief filed - oral argument requested 
04/09/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/06/2018Brief received - oral argument requested 
04/06/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/06/2018Brief was not filed 
04/04/2018Appellants brief due 
03/03/2018Record due 
03/02/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
02/28/2018Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/14/2018Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal filed 
02/09/2018Fee paid 
02/09/2018Docketing statement filed 
02/08/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
02/07/2018Fee requested 
02/07/2018Docketing statement due 
02/06/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
02/02/2018Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
12/04/2017Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
11/03/2017Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/09/2018At IssueReady to set for oral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Morrison, James AppelleeJames Morrison
Inman, BryanAppellantRobert W. Minshew
Angela D. Norris
Henry Loe, Jr. and Patrick Henry Medical, LLCAppelleeGary D. Corley
Trial Court Information
397th Judicial District Court 
Grayson 
Honorable Brian K. Gary 
CV-14-0482 
Janet Kamras 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site