Fifth Court of Appeals

Case: 05-18-00020-CR    
05-18-00020-CR
01/08/2018
Aggravated Robbery
Jack Anthony Chatman Jr. 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/24/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
07/05/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
05/09/2018Brief was not filedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/23/2018Submitted 
09/06/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
09/03/2018State brief due 
08/24/2018Case ready to be set 
08/24/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
08/06/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/04/2018State brief due 
08/03/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
07/10/2018Appearance of counsel 
07/10/2018Appellants brief due 
07/05/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
06/21/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
06/19/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/15/2018Appellants brief due 
05/11/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
05/10/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/09/2018Brief was not filed 
05/04/2018Appellants brief due 
04/18/2018Reporters record due 
04/03/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
03/29/2018Order enteredOtherwise Disposed
03/22/2018Reporters record due 
03/15/2018Trial court certification filed 
03/03/2018Response due 
03/03/2018Supplemental clerks record due 
02/21/2018Letter issued by the court 
02/21/2018Order enteredOtherwise Disposed
02/20/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
02/15/2018No reporters record filed in criminal case 
02/14/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
02/13/2018Record due 
01/09/2018Docketing statement filed 
01/08/2018Docketing statement due 
01/08/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
12/15/2017Judgment signed by trial court judge 
12/15/2017Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/23/2018SubmittedSubmitted on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Chatman, Jr., Jack AnthonyCriminal - AppellantAllan Fishburn
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasFaith Johnson  
Justin Johnson
Lori Ordiway  
Trial Court Information
292nd Judicial District Court 
Dallas 
Honorable Brandon Birmingham 
F-1720589-V 
Peri Wood 
15 years institutional division, TDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site