Fifth Court of Appeals

Case: 05-17-01447-CV    
05-17-01447-CV
12/18/2017
Contract
Primestar Construction, Inc. 
City of Dallas, Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/30/2018Reply brief filedAppellant
04/26/2018Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
04/26/2018Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
03/27/2018Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/14/2018Order enteredOtherwise Disposed
11/12/2018Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
10/03/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
04/30/2018Reply brief filed 
04/26/2018Brief filed - oral argument requested 
04/26/2018Case ready to be set 
04/26/2018Brief filed - oral argument requested 
04/26/2018Appellees brief due 
03/29/2018Appellants brief due 
03/27/2018Brief filed - oral argument requested 
02/28/2018Record due 
02/27/2018Opinion withdrawn 
02/27/2018Order enteredVacated
02/27/2018Case reinstated 
02/21/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
02/20/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
01/31/2018Motion for rehearing filed 
01/31/2018Fee paid 
01/31/2018Docketing statement filed 
01/31/2018Corrected document requested 
01/30/2018Memorandum opinion issuedDismissed
01/30/2018Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
12/20/2017Letter filed 
12/18/2017Fee requested 
12/18/2017Docketing statement due 
12/18/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
12/15/2017Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
11/09/2017Request for findings of fact and conclusions of law 
10/31/2017Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/26/2018At IssueReady to set for oral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Primestar Construction, Inc.AppellantJoseph Rutherford Willie II
Lori Chambers Gray
City of Dallas, TexasAppelleeCharles Estee
Trial Court Information
192nd Judicial District Court 
Dallas 
Honorable Craig Smith 
DC-17-05460 
Tenesa Shaw 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site