Fifth Court of Appeals

Case: 05-17-01437-CV    
05-17-01437-CV
12/11/2017
Divorce
In The Interest of A.D.J., A Child 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/09/2018Amended brief filedAppellant
04/27/2018Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/15/2018Order enteredOtherwise Disposed
10/12/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
06/11/2018Case ready to be set 
06/11/2018Appellees brief due 
05/27/2018Appellees brief due 
05/11/2018Amended brief due 
05/09/2018Amended brief filed 
05/08/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
05/04/2018Motion to file amended brief filed 
04/30/2018Corrected document requested 
04/30/2018Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
04/27/2018Brief filed - oral argument requested 
04/27/2018Appellants brief due 
03/28/2018Appellants brief due 
03/27/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
03/23/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/12/2018Supplemental clerks record due 
02/26/2018Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
02/23/2018Order enteredOtherwise Disposed
02/07/2018Supplemental reporters record due 
01/20/2018Appellants brief due 
01/19/2018Record due 
01/18/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
01/16/2018Motion filed 
01/16/2018Supplemental clerks record due 
01/11/2018Notice filed 
01/10/2018Notice filed 
01/10/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
01/05/2018Letter issued by the court 
01/02/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
12/29/2017Order enteredMotion or Writ Denied
12/28/2017Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
12/21/2017Motion for extension of time to file record filed 
12/21/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
12/21/2017Docketing statement filed 
12/20/2017Statement of inability to afford costs filed in the court of appeals 
12/19/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
12/18/2017Corrected document requested 
12/15/2017Fee requested 
12/15/2017Docketing statement due 
12/13/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
12/11/2017Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
12/11/2017Case began in court of appeals 
09/22/2017Request for findings of fact and conclusions of law 
09/21/2017Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/11/2018At IssueReady to set for oral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jones, Coretta D.AppellantNelda Harris
Denmark, Danny W.AppelleeDanny W. Denmark
Trial Court Information
255th Judicial District Court 
Dallas 
Honorable Kim Cooks 
DF-16-19730 
Joie Rivera 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site