Fifth Court of Appeals

Case: 05-17-01393-CV    
05-17-01393-CV
12/04/2017
Real Property
Woodhaven Dr. 1401 Land Trust 
Bank of America, N.A. 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/30/2018Reply brief filedAppellant
04/16/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
03/16/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/07/2018Submitted 
09/20/2018Set for submission on briefs 
04/30/2018Reply brief filed 
04/30/2018Corrected document requested 
04/16/2018Case ready to be set 
04/16/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
04/15/2018Appellees brief due 
04/13/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
03/16/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
03/16/2018Appellants brief due 
03/09/2018Appellants brief due 
03/08/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
03/06/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/08/2018Appellants brief due 
02/06/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/05/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/09/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
01/06/2018Record due 
01/05/2018Letter filed 
01/04/2018No payment arrangements made with court reporter for record 
01/04/2018Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
12/11/2017Docketing statement filed 
12/11/2017Fee paid 
12/11/2017Corrected document requested 
12/04/2017Fee requested 
12/04/2017Docketing statement due 
12/04/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
12/01/2017Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
09/27/2017Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
09/08/2017Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/07/2018SubmittedSubmitted on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Bank of America, N.A.AppelleeCrystal G. Roach
Woodhaven Dr. 1401 Land TrustAppellantKenneth S. Harter
Trial Court Information
416th Judicial District Court 
Collin 
Honorable Andrea Thompson 
416-02540-2016 
Destiny M. Moses 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site