Fifth Court of Appeals

Case: 05-17-01392-CR    
05-17-01392-CR
12/04/2017
Aggravated Robbery
James Albert Morris 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/15/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
05/14/2018Brief received - oral argument not requestedState
03/09/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/09/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
11/09/2018Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
10/24/2018Submitted 
08/31/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
05/15/2018Case ready to be set 
05/15/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
05/15/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/14/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/14/2018Brief received - oral argument not requested 
05/08/2018Case ready to be set 
05/08/2018State brief due 
04/10/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/09/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/08/2018State brief due 
03/09/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
03/09/2018Appellants brief due 
02/21/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/20/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/17/2018Appellants brief due 
01/23/2018Exhibits filed 
01/18/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
01/09/2018No reporters record filed in criminal case 
01/08/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
01/08/2018Record due 
12/14/2017Docketing statement filed 
12/04/2017Case Information Sheet from trial court clerk filed 
12/04/2017Trial court certification filed 
12/04/2017Docketing statement due 
12/04/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
11/29/2017Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
11/09/2017Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/19/2019StatusMandate to Issue
11/09/2043RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Morris, James AlbertCriminal - AppellantClaire Monsman Petty
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasGreg Willis
John R. Rolater Jr.
Libby Joy Lange
Trial Court Information
219th Judicial District Court 
Collin 
Honorable Scott J. Becker 
219-80228-2016 
Indu Bailey 
10 years institutional division, TDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site