Fifth Court of Appeals

Case: 05-17-01348-CV    
05-17-01348-CV
11/22/2017
Contract
Robert LaRose 
REHJ, Inc. d/b/a Holmes, Diggs & Eames 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/12/2018Amended brief filedAppellee
04/11/2018Amended brief receivedAppellee
03/29/2018Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
01/25/2018Amended brief filedAppellant
01/16/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/31/2018Submitted 
08/30/2018Set for submission on briefs 
04/23/2018Amended brief due 
04/12/2018Amended brief filed 
04/12/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
04/11/2018Amended brief received 
04/11/2018Motion to file amended brief filed 
04/05/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
03/29/2018Case ready to be set 
03/29/2018Brief filed - oral argument requested 
03/29/2018Corrected document requested 
03/28/2018Appellees brief due 
02/28/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
02/26/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/24/2018Appellees brief due 
01/29/2018Amended brief due 
01/25/2018Amended brief filed 
01/25/2018Corrected brief requested 
01/24/2018Motion to file amended brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/22/2018Motion to file amended brief filed 
01/18/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
01/16/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
01/14/2018Appellants brief due 
12/21/2017Record due 
12/15/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
11/28/2017Docketing statement filed 
11/27/2017Statement of inability to afford costs filed in the court of appeals 
11/27/2017Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
11/27/2017Fee requested 
11/27/2017Docketing statement due 
11/22/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
11/21/2017Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
05/21/2017Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/31/2018SubmittedSubmitted on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
REHJ, Inc. d/b/a Holmes, Diggs & EamesAppelleeJohn Kappel
Christopher Harding
LaRose, RobertAppellantLance Hunter Beshara  
Trial Court Information
95th Judicial District Court 
Dallas 
Honorable Ken Molberg 
DC-17-03886 
Deana K. Rouse 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site