Fifth Court of Appeals

Case: 05-17-01313-CV    
05-17-01313-CV
11/14/2017
Real Property
Mohamed Ahmed 
Charles Kaguma, Mary Mbogo, Martin Nganga 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/02/2018Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
01/31/2018Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
01/12/2018Brief was not filedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/13/2018Submitted 
11/08/2018Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
11/07/2018Appearance of counsel 
09/13/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
04/02/2018Case ready to be set 
04/02/2018Brief filed - oral argument requested 
04/01/2018Appellees brief due 
03/02/2018Appellees brief due 
02/22/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/21/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/21/2018Appearance of counsel 
01/31/2018Brief filed - oral argument requested 
01/31/2018Appellants brief due 
01/17/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/16/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/12/2018Brief was not filed 
01/10/2018Letter filed 
01/10/2018Corrected document requested 
01/01/2018Appellants brief due 
12/22/2017No payment arrangements made with court reporter for record 
12/22/2017Letter filed 
12/21/2017Docketing statement filed 
12/21/2017Fee paid 
12/16/2017Record due 
12/01/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
11/15/2017Fee requested 
11/15/2017Docketing statement due 
11/14/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
11/09/2017Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
09/14/2017Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
08/18/2017Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/13/2018SubmittedSubmitted on oral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ahmed, MohamedAppellantWilliam Chu  
Charles Kaguma, Mary Mbogo, Martin NgangaAppelleeJennifer Luette
Gregory Howell Dimmick
David Jefrie Mizgala  
Trial Court Information
101st Judicial District Court 
Dallas 
Honorable Staci Williams 
DC-16-15864 
Thu Bui 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site