Fifth Court of Appeals

Case: 05-17-01304-CV    
05-17-01304-CV
11/13/2017
Contract
The Fan Expo, LLC 
National Football League 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/06/2018Sealed reply brief filedAppellant
07/03/2018Sealed brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
05/04/2018Sealed brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/31/2018Response filed 
10/31/2018Motion to reset oral argument disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/29/2018Motion to reset oral argument filed 
10/12/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
08/06/2018Sealed reply brief filed 
08/06/2018Reply brief due 
07/20/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
07/17/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
07/03/2018Sealed brief filed - oral argument requested 
07/03/2018Case ready to be set 
07/03/2018Appellees brief due 
06/03/2018Appellees brief due 
05/18/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/17/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/16/2018Sealed supplemental clerks record filed 
05/07/2018Response due 
05/04/2018Sealed brief filed - oral argument requested 
05/04/2018Appellants brief due 
05/02/2018Letter issued by the court 
04/26/2018Letter filed 
04/25/2018Letter issued by the court 
04/23/2018Sealed supplemental clerks record filed 
04/20/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
04/04/2018Appellants brief due 
04/03/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
03/30/2018Appellants brief due 
03/29/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/22/2018Letter filed 
03/02/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/01/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/28/2018Reporters record filed 
02/02/2018Sealed clerk record filed 
02/02/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
01/24/2018No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record 
01/24/2018Letter filed 
01/16/2018No clerks record filed in civil case 
01/12/2018Record due 
12/11/2017Letter filed 
12/05/2017Docketing statement filed 
12/05/2017Corrected document requested 
12/05/2017Amended notice of appeal filed 
12/04/2017Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/21/2017Reply to response or motion filed 
11/20/2017Response filed 
11/13/2017Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal filed 
11/13/2017Fee paid 
11/13/2017Docketing statement due 
11/13/2017Judgment signed by trial court judge 
11/13/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
11/10/2017Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/03/2018At IssueReady to set for oral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Electronic Arts, Inc.Appellee 
The Fan Expo, LLCAppellantDavid S. Coale  
Michael Kalis
Julie Pettit  
David Urteago
Michael K. Hurst
National Football LeagueAppelleeAnne McGowan Johnson  
Jamee Cotton
Richard Thaddeus Behrens
Andrew Guthrie
Charles Jones II
Trial Court Information
44th Judicial District Court 
Dallas 
Honorable Bonnie L. Goldstein 
DC-16-04875 
David Langford 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site