Fifth Court of Appeals

Case: 05-17-01258-CV    
05-17-01258-CV
11/01/2017
Contract
Johnny E. Webb, III 
Diversegy, LLC, Diversegy Consultant Program, LLC, Lucien J. Tujague, Dominion Gas Holdings, LP, and Alex Rodriguez 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
06/11/2018Reply brief filedAppellant
05/21/2018Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
03/22/2018Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
03/21/2018Brief received - oral argument requestedAppellant
01/25/2018Brief was not filedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/14/2018Order enteredOtherwise Disposed
10/03/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
06/11/2018Reply brief filed 
05/21/2018Case ready to be set 
05/21/2018Brief filed - oral argument requested 
05/21/2018Appellees brief due 
04/21/2018Appellees brief due 
04/10/2018Order received from trial courtMotion or Writ Denied
04/05/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/04/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/03/2018Response filed 
03/29/2018Notice received 
03/29/2018Motion to transfer filed 
03/22/2018Brief filed - oral argument requested 
03/22/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/21/2018Brief received - oral argument requested 
03/21/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/19/2018Corrected motion requested 
03/16/2018Corrected document requested 
03/16/2018Corrected motion requested 
03/15/2018Appellants brief due 
02/13/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
02/12/2018Reporters record due 
01/31/2018Order enteredOtherwise Disposed
01/29/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/26/2018Corrected motion requested 
01/25/2018Brief was not filed 
01/03/2018Appellants brief due 
12/20/2017Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
12/19/2017Docketing statement filed 
12/19/2017Corrected document requested 
12/18/2017Fee paid 
12/12/2017Supplemental clerks record due 
12/05/2017Letter issued by the court 
12/04/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
12/04/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
11/30/2017No payment arrangements made with court reporter for record 
11/29/2017Letter filed 
11/28/2017No reporters record filed in civil case 
11/28/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
11/26/2017Record due 
11/01/2017Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
11/01/2017Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
11/01/2017Fee requested 
11/01/2017Docketing statement due 
11/01/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
10/27/2017Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
08/18/2017Request for findings of fact and conclusions of law 
07/29/2017Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/21/2018At IssueReady to set for oral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Dominion Gas Holdings, LP, Lucien J. Tujaque and Alex RodriguezAppelleeSonya D. Reddy
Jim Moseley
Andrew K. York
Webb, III, Johnny E.AppellantLashawn A. Williams
Diversegy, LLC, Diversegy Consultant Program, LLCAppelleeBarrett Lesher
Bryan Stevens  
Trial Court Information
95th Judicial District Court 
Dallas 
Honorable Ken Molberg 
DC-16-14649 
Deana K. Rouse 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site