Fifth Court of Appeals

Case: 05-17-01242-CV    
05-17-01242-CV
10/26/2017
Personal Injury
Jacqueline Gibson 
Stonebriar Mall, LLC, d/b/a Stonebriar Centre, Xencom Facility Management, LLC. and Mydatt Services, Inc. d/b/a Valor Security Services 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/14/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
05/14/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
04/26/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
02/14/2018Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
02/12/2018Brief received - oral argument requestedAppellant
01/30/2018Brief was not filedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/24/2018Motion for oral argument disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/23/2018Motion for oral argument filed 
10/03/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
05/16/2018Appellees brief due 
05/14/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
05/14/2018Case ready to be set 
05/14/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
04/30/2018Appellees brief due 
04/26/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
04/17/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
04/16/2018Appellees brief due 
04/16/2018Appellees brief due 
04/12/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/12/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
04/11/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/20/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
03/16/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/16/2018Appellees brief due 
03/15/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
03/13/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/14/2018Brief filed - oral argument requested 
02/14/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
02/12/2018Brief received - oral argument requested 
02/12/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/09/2018Appellants brief due 
02/07/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
02/05/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/30/2018Brief was not filed 
01/28/2018Appellants brief due 
12/29/2017Appellants brief due 
12/21/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/20/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/01/2017Appearance of counsel 
11/29/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
11/28/2017Response filed 
11/27/2017No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record 
11/27/2017Letter filed 
11/24/2017Record due 
11/10/2017Fee paid 
11/10/2017Docketing statement filed 
10/27/2017Fee requested 
10/27/2017Docketing statement due 
10/26/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
10/25/2017Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
08/26/2017Request for findings of fact and conclusions of law 
08/26/2017Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
07/27/2017Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/27/2018SubmissionOral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Stonebriar Mall, LLC, d/b/a Stonebriar Centre, Xencom Facility Management, LLC.AppelleeMarc Hedges Fanning
Jennifer Kelley  
Mydatt Services, Inc. d/b/a Valor Security ServicesAppelleeEric Lee Gruetzner
Milan G. Marinkovich
Gibson, JacquelineAppellantRhonda R. Bartlett
Thomas Albert Carse  
Trial Court Information
366th Judicial District Court 
Collin 
Honorable Raymond G. Wheless 
366-04270-2016 
Antoinette Varela 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site