Fifth Court of Appeals

Case: 05-17-01182-CV    
05-17-01182-CV
10/12/2017
Contract
Chan Il Pak 
Ad Villarai, LLC., The Ashley Nicole Williams Trust, Villas on Raiford, LLC., and Terri Anderson, and Villas on Raiford Carrollton Senior Housing, LLC. 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/30/2018Reply brief filedAppellant
03/20/2018Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
02/12/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/02/2018Motion to reset oral argument disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/31/2018Motion to reset oral argument filed 
10/08/2018Corrected entry made by clerks office 
09/12/2018Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
09/06/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
04/30/2018Reply brief filed 
04/30/2018Reply brief due 
04/18/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
04/16/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
03/21/2018Appellees brief due 
03/20/2018Case ready to be set 
03/20/2018Brief filed - oral argument requested 
03/19/2018Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
03/15/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/14/2018Appellees brief due 
03/13/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/12/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
02/10/2018Appellants brief due 
01/12/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/11/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/11/2018Appellants brief due 
12/14/2017Notice filed 
12/14/2017Reporters record due 
12/12/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
11/14/2017Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
11/10/2017Motion for extension of time to file record filed 
11/10/2017Record due 
11/07/2017Order enteredDeferred
11/06/2017Response filed 
10/25/2017Motion to dismiss filed 
10/23/2017Docketing statement filed 
10/23/2017Fee paid 
10/23/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
10/13/2017Fee requested 
10/13/2017Docketing statement due 
10/12/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
10/11/2017Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
08/14/2017Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
08/02/2017Findings of fact and conclusions of law filed 
07/13/2017Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/20/2018At IssueReady to set for oral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ad Villarai, LLC., The Ashley Nicole Williams Trust, Villas on Raiford, LLC., and Terri Anderson, and Villas on Raiford Carrollton Senior Housing, LLC.AppelleeWilliam F. Lepage
David M. Pruessner
Peter C. D'Apice  
Pak, Chan IlAppellantChan Il Pak
Trial Court Information
101st Judicial District Court 
Dallas 
Honorable Staci Williams 
DC-15-00432 
Terralyn Gentry 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site