Fifth Court of Appeals

Case: 05-17-01139-CV    
05-17-01139-CV
09/28/2017
Securities and Stocks
PS Royal Services Group LP, GP Royal, LLC, Stephen F. Perkins, and S. Perkins Investment Properties, Inc. 
Scott Fisher and Kristi Fisher 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
09/28/2018Reply brief filedAppellant
09/27/2018Reply brief receivedAppellant
09/06/2018Reply brief filedAppellant
08/27/2018Reply brief receivedAppellant
07/18/2018Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
05/09/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
05/08/2018Brief received - oral argument requestedAppellant
04/27/2018Brief received - oral argument requestedAppellant
04/18/2018Brief was not filedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/15/2018Order enteredOtherwise Disposed
10/12/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
09/28/2018Reply brief filed 
09/28/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
09/27/2018Reply brief received 
09/27/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
09/24/2018Reply brief due 
09/12/2018Order enteredOtherwise Disposed
09/06/2018Response filed 
09/06/2018Reply brief filed 
09/06/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
09/05/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
08/27/2018Reply brief received 
08/24/2018Reply brief due 
08/21/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
08/20/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
07/20/2018Appellees brief due 
07/18/2018Case ready to be set 
07/18/2018Brief filed - oral argument requested 
06/08/2018Appellees brief due 
06/05/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
06/04/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/24/2018Motion to stay disposedMotion or Writ Denied
05/24/2018Motion to stay filed 
05/16/2018Motion for mediation disposedMotion or Writ Denied
05/15/2018Motion for mediation filed 
05/09/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
05/09/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
05/08/2018Brief received - oral argument requested 
05/08/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/08/2018Corrected motion requested 
04/27/2018Brief received - oral argument requested 
04/26/2018Email received 
04/18/2018Brief was not filed 
04/16/2018Appellants brief due 
04/10/2018Appellants brief due 
04/09/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
04/06/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/05/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
03/28/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
03/15/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/14/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/12/2018Corrected motion requested 
03/11/2018Appellants brief due 
02/14/2018Reporters record due 
02/09/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
01/31/2018Order enteredOtherwise Disposed
01/29/2018Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
01/26/2018Reporters record due 
12/27/2017Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
12/21/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
11/20/2017No reporters record filed in civil case 
11/14/2017Docketing statement filed 
11/08/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
10/27/2017Record due 
10/19/2017Fee paid 
09/29/2017Fee requested 
09/29/2017Docketing statement due 
09/28/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
09/27/2017Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
07/29/2017Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
06/29/2017Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/18/2018At IssueReady to set for oral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
PS Royal Services Group LP, GP Royal, LLC, Stephen F. Perkins, and S. Perkins Investment Properties, Inc.AppellantJeff R. Boggess  
Scott Fisher and Kristi FisherAppelleeCarl David Adams  
Joshua Andor  
Trial Court Information
219th Judicial District Court 
Collin 
Honorable Scott J. Becker 
219-01665-2014 
Tonya Lebo 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site