Fifth Court of Appeals

Case: 05-17-01115-CV    
05-17-01115-CV
09/21/2017
Injunction
Patrick Daugherty 
Highland Capital Management, L.P. 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/01/2018Reply brief filedAppellant
08/22/2018Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
05/24/2018Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
11/20/2017Letter brief filedAppellee
11/10/2017Letter brief filedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/12/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
10/01/2018Reply brief filed 
10/01/2018Reply brief due 
09/07/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
09/06/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
08/27/2018Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
08/22/2018Case ready to be set 
08/22/2018Brief filed - oral argument requested 
08/22/2018Appellees brief due 
07/23/2018Appellees brief due 
07/17/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
07/16/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/23/2018Appellees brief due 
06/19/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/18/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/24/2018Brief filed - oral argument requested 
05/24/2018Appellants brief due 
04/24/2018Appellants brief due 
04/18/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/17/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/12/2018Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
03/25/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
03/02/2018Notice filed 
02/23/2018No reporters record filed in civil case 
02/21/2018Reporters record due 
01/22/2018Letter issued by the court 
12/21/2017Response filed 
12/21/2017Fee paid 
12/12/2017Letter issued by the court 
11/20/2017Letter brief filed 
11/20/2017Response due regarding jurisdiction 
11/16/2017Appearance of counsel 
11/10/2017Letter brief filed 
11/10/2017Response due regarding jurisdiction 
11/01/2017Letter issued by the court for lack of jurisdiction or defect 
10/24/2017No reporters record filed in civil case 
10/21/2017Record due 
10/11/2017Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
10/11/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
10/02/2017Docketing statement filed 
09/22/2017Fee requested 
09/22/2017Docketing statement due 
09/21/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
09/20/2017Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
06/23/2017Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/19/2018SubmissionOral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Highland Capital Management, L.P.AppelleeA. Shonn Brown  
Scott E. Gant
Marc D. Katz  
Marc A. Fuller  
Michael K. Hurst
Thomas S. Leatherbury  
Crystal Woods
Jonathan Childers  
Scott A. Brister  
Isabel A. Crosby  
Daugherty, PatrickAppellantAndrew K. York
Sonya D. Reddy
Dylan O. Drummond  
Jim Moseley
Trial Court Information
68th Judicial District Court 
Dallas 
Honorable Martin Hoffman 
DC-12-04005 
Antionette Reagor 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site