Fifth Court of Appeals

Case: 05-17-01072-CV    
05-17-01072-CV
09/11/2017
Probate
In the Estate of Frances Faccibene, Deceased 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/30/2018Reply brief filedAppellant
04/11/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
03/12/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
12/06/2017Letter brief filedAppellee
11/27/2017Letter brief filedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/01/2018Memorandum opinion issuedReversed and Rendered and Remanded In Part
11/01/2018Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
10/31/2018Submitted 
09/07/2018Motion to withdraw attorney disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/05/2018Motion to withdraw attorney filed 
08/30/2018Set for submission on briefs 
04/30/2018Reply brief filed 
04/11/2018Case ready to be set 
04/11/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
04/11/2018Appellees brief due 
03/14/2018Appearance of counsel 
03/14/2018Letter filed 
03/12/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
03/12/2018Corrected document requested 
03/12/2018Appellants brief due 
02/09/2018Letter issued by the court 
12/07/2017Response due regarding jurisdiction 
12/06/2017Letter brief filed 
12/01/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
11/27/2017Letter brief filed 
10/26/2017Response due regarding jurisdiction 
10/16/2017Letter issued by the court for lack of jurisdiction or defect 
10/16/2017Record due 
10/11/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
09/11/2017Docketing statement filed 
09/11/2017Docketing statement due 
09/11/2017Fee paid 
09/11/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
08/29/2017Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
08/17/2017Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/12/2019StatusMandate to Issue
11/01/2024RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Faccibene, Jr., Joseph AppellantPeter C. Hall  
Isaac Shutt
Papa, Anthony JosephAppelleeNathan White  
Trial Court Information
Probate Court No. 2 
Dallas 
Honorable Ingrid M. Warren 
PR-17-00683-2 
Andrea L. Reed 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site