Fifth Court of Appeals

Case: 05-17-01054-CV    
05-17-01054-CV
09/07/2017
Contract
Best Buy Stores, L.P. 
Shops At Pinnacle Park, LLC 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
02/28/2018Reply brief filedAppellant
01/25/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
11/27/2017Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/16/2018Submitted 
10/12/2018Motion for oral argument disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/12/2018Motion for oral argument filed 
09/24/2018Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
09/21/2018Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
09/05/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
02/28/2018Reply brief filed 
02/28/2018Reply brief due 
02/07/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/06/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
01/25/2018Case ready to be set 
01/25/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
01/25/2018Corrected document requested 
01/25/2018Appellees brief due 
12/27/2017Appellees brief due 
11/30/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/29/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
11/27/2017Brief filed - oral argument requested 
11/27/2017Appellants brief due 
11/14/2017Motion to appear pro hac vice disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/03/2017Motion in support of motion to appear pro hac vice filed 
11/03/2017Motion to appear pro hac vice filed 
10/28/2017Appellants brief due 
10/09/2017Record due 
10/05/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/04/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/28/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
09/15/2017Fee paid 
09/13/2017Docketing statement filed 
09/07/2017Fee requested 
09/07/2017Docketing statement due 
09/07/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
09/05/2017Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
08/10/2017Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/16/2018SubmittedSubmitted on oral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Best Buy Stores, L.P.AppellantStuart M. Reynolds Jr.
Michael Aaron Geibelson
Shops At Pinnacle Park, LLCAppelleeJohn D. Fraser  
Danise A. McMahon
Trial Court Information
134th Judicial District Court 
Dallas 
Honorable Dale B. Tillery 
DC-16-04728 
Vielica Dobbins 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site