Fifth Court of Appeals

Case: 05-17-01052-CR    
05-17-01052-CR
09/07/2017
Injury to a Child, Elderly or Disabled Individual
Anthony Troy Chiplin Jr. 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/30/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
05/04/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
01/22/2018Brief was not filedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/24/2018Submitted 
08/30/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
08/06/2018State brief due 
07/30/2018Case ready to be set 
07/30/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
07/10/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
07/05/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
07/03/2018State brief due 
06/05/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/04/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/03/2018State brief due 
05/18/2018Appellants brief due 
05/09/2018Appearance of counsel 
05/04/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
04/17/2018Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
04/15/2018Supplemental clerks record due 
04/15/2018Supplemental reporters record due 
04/05/2018Hearing record due 
04/02/2018Sealed clerk record filed 
04/02/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
03/26/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
03/26/2018Case reinstated 
03/23/2018Docketing statement filed 
03/22/2018Motion to reinstate filed 
03/06/2018Order issuedAbated
02/09/2018Appellants brief due 
01/23/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
01/22/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/22/2018Brief was not filed 
01/19/2018Appellants brief due 
12/21/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/20/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/20/2017Appellants brief due 
12/06/2017Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
11/28/2017Exhibits filed 
11/20/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
11/19/2017Reporters record due 
10/24/2017Record due 
10/23/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
10/20/2017Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
10/17/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
09/07/2017Docketing statement filed 
09/07/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
08/29/2017Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
08/25/2017Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/24/2018SubmittedSubmitted on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasFaith Johnson  
Kimberly Duncan  
Chiplin, Jr., Anthony TroyCriminal - AppellantChristian T. Souza
Trial Court Information
283rd Judicial District Court 
Dallas 
Honorable Hon. Livia Liu Francis 
F-1700211-T 
Mary Snider 
10 years institutional division, TDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site