Fifth Court of Appeals

Case: 05-17-00969-CV    
05-17-00969-CV
08/16/2017
Contract
Richardson Communications & Consulting, Inc. 
James H. McNeese 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/03/2018Reply brief filedAppellant
04/13/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
02/21/2018Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
09/15/2017Letter brief filedAppellee
09/08/2017Letter brief filedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/14/2018Submitted 
11/13/2018Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
11/13/2018Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
11/13/2018Corrected document requested 
11/13/2018Corrected document requested 
11/09/2018Corrected entry made by clerks office 
11/06/2018Letter filed 
09/18/2018Motion for oral argument disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/17/2018Motion for oral argument filed 
09/13/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
05/03/2018Reply brief filed 
04/13/2018Case ready to be set 
04/13/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
04/13/2018Appellees brief due 
03/23/2018Appellees brief due 
03/16/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/15/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/21/2018Brief filed - oral argument requested 
02/21/2018Sealed supplemental clerks record filed 
02/21/2018Appellants brief due 
01/22/2018Appellants brief due 
01/18/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/17/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/04/2018Appearance of counsel 
01/02/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
01/02/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
12/22/2017Fee paid 
12/21/2017Letter issued by the court 
12/20/2017Fee requested 
11/13/2017Supplemental clerks record due 
11/06/2017Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
11/02/2017Letter issued by the court 
09/29/2017Record due 
09/23/2017Appellants brief due 
09/19/2017Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
09/18/2017Response due regarding jurisdiction 
09/15/2017Letter brief filed 
09/08/2017Letter brief filed 
09/08/2017Response due regarding jurisdiction 
08/30/2017Appearance of counsel 
08/30/2017Fee requested 
08/30/2017Docketing statement due 
08/30/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
08/28/2017Letter issued by the court for lack of jurisdiction or defect 
08/24/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
08/23/2017Fee paid 
08/21/2017Docketing statement filed 
08/18/2017Corrected document requested 
08/17/2017Docketing statement due 
08/17/2017Fee requested 
08/16/2017Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
08/16/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
06/30/2017Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
06/01/2017Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/14/2018SubmittedSubmitted on oral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
McNeese, James H.AppelleeJon-Bernard Schwartz
Brandon C. Marx
Robert Thomas Slovak
Stacy R. Obenhaus  
Haleigh H. Jones
Richardson Communications & Consulting, Inc.AppellantCharles J. Crawford  
Larry R. Boyd
Trial Court Information
401st Judicial District Court 
Collin 
Honorable Mark J. Rusch 
401-02740-2017 
Kimberly Tinsley 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site