Fifth Court of Appeals

Case: 05-17-00938-CV    
05-17-00938-CV
08/10/2017
Miscellaneous/other civil
In Re: The Commitment of Marcus Eloise Rollings 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/12/2018Reply brief filedAppellant
03/28/2018Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
03/06/2018Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/07/2018Submitted 
11/01/2018Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
09/07/2018Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
09/06/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
04/12/2018Reply brief filed 
04/05/2018Appellees brief due 
03/28/2018Case ready to be set 
03/28/2018Brief filed - oral argument requested 
03/09/2018Appellants brief due 
03/06/2018Appearance of counsel 
03/06/2018Brief filed - oral argument requested 
03/06/2018Corrected document requested 
02/07/2018Appellants brief due 
01/31/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/30/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/09/2018Reporters record due 
01/08/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
12/20/2017Order enteredOtherwise Disposed
12/08/2017Letter filed 
08/30/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
08/14/2017Docketing statement filed 
08/11/2017No clerks record filed in civil case 
08/11/2017No reporters record filed in civil case 
08/11/2017Docketing statement due 
08/10/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
07/29/2017Record due 
06/14/2017Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
04/18/2017Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court 
03/31/2017Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/07/2018SubmittedSubmitted on oral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASAppelleeFaith Johnson  
Douglas Gladden  
Rollings, Marcus EloiseAppellantJohn C. Moncure
Kenneth D. Nash
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 2 
Dallas 
Honorable Hon. Nancy Elizabeth Kennedy 
CV-16-70006 
Debi Harris 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site