Fifth Court of Appeals

Case: 05-17-00927-CV    
05-17-00927-CV
08/07/2017
Contract
Prophet Equity LP and Ross Gatlin 
Twin City Fire Insurance Company 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/24/2018Reply brief filedAppellant
04/23/2018Sealed brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
04/19/2018Brief received - oral argument requestedAppellee
01/19/2018Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/08/2018Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
11/08/2018Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument 
09/13/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
08/15/2018Letter filed 
07/09/2018Motion to withdraw attorney disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/22/2018Motion to withdraw attorney filed 
05/24/2018Reply brief filed 
05/24/2018Reply brief due 
05/08/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
05/04/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
04/23/2018Case ready to be set 
04/23/2018Sealed brief filed - oral argument requested 
04/23/2018Motion to seal the record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/19/2018Brief received - oral argument requested 
04/19/2018Motion to seal the record filed 
04/19/2018Appellees brief due 
03/20/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
03/20/2018Appellees brief due 
03/19/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/18/2018Appellees brief due 
02/13/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/12/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/12/2018Appearance of counsel 
02/08/2018Letter filed 
02/06/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
02/02/2018No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record 
02/02/2018Clerks notice to court regarding status of record 
01/26/2018Appellants brief due 
01/19/2018Brief filed - oral argument requested 
01/12/2018Appearance of counsel 
12/29/2017Sealed supplemental clerks record filed 
12/26/2017Supplemental clerks record due 
12/22/2017Appellants brief due 
12/12/2017Record checked out 
12/11/2017Appearance of counsel 
12/08/2017Order enteredOtherwise Disposed
12/04/2017Motion filed 
12/04/2017Corrected motion requested 
12/02/2017Appellants brief due 
12/01/2017Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
11/27/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
11/21/2017In camera documents received 
11/02/2017Appellants brief due 
10/30/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/27/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/03/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
09/25/2017Reporters record due 
09/14/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/13/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
09/13/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
09/13/2017No clerks record filed in civil case 
09/13/2017No reporters record filed in civil case 
09/12/2017Record due 
08/11/2017Fee paid 
08/10/2017Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
08/10/2017Docketing statement filed 
08/08/2017Fee requested 
08/08/2017Docketing statement due 
08/07/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
08/03/2017Notice of appeal filed in trial court 
07/14/2017Judgment signed by trial court judge 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/13/2018SubmissionOral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Prophet Equity LP and Ross GatlinAppellantRex Mann
Stephanie Nelson
Deborah G. Hankinson  
John C.C. Sanders Jr.
Hayden L Duffy
Thomas M. Melsheimer  
Steven H. Stodghill  
Twin City Fire Insurance CompanyAppelleeJeffrey M. Tillotson  
Jonathan Patton
Scott P. Stolley
Joseph Irrobali
Trial Court Information
134th Judicial District Court 
Dallas 
Honorable Dale B. Tillery 
DC-14-12313 
Vielica Dobbins 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site